This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2021 at 06:53:49 (UTC).

Canyon Capital Advisors LLC v. PG&E Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Canyon Capital Advisors LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against PG E Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04949

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellant

Canyon Capital Advisors LLC

Appellee

PG&E Corporation

Trustee

Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF

Not Classified By Court

Official Committee of Tort Claimants

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

David Levine

Attorney at Groom Law Group, Chartered

1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw #1200

Washington, DC 20006

Jared R Friedmann

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Dara Levinson Silveira

Attorney at Keller and Benvenutti LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Tobias S. Keller

Attorney at Keller & Benvenutti

650 California Street, Suite 1900, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Katherine B Kohn

Attorney at Groom Law Group, Chartered

1701 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20006

David A. Herman

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Omid H. Nasab

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Trustee Attorneys

Jason Blumberg

Attorney at Office of the U.S.Trustee

501 I Street, #7-500

Sacramento, CA 95814

Cameron Gulden

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

300 Booth Street, Room 3009

Reno, NV 89509

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Lauren T. Attard

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

David B. Rivkin, Jr.

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, #1100

Washington, DC 20036

Lars H. Fuller

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1801 California Street, #4400

Denver, CO 80202

Chris Bator

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

3200 National City Center, 1900 East 9Th Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Eric R. Goodman

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Robert Alan Julian, Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94111-2806

Erin Elizabeth Dexter

Attorney at Milbank LLP

1850 K. St., Nw #1100

Washington, DC 20006

Dennis F. Dunne

Attorney at Milbank LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Gregory Allan Bray

Attorney at Milbank LLP

2029 Century Park East, 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3019

Pul S. Aronzon

Attorney at Milbank LLP

2029 Centruy Park East 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

James Cornell Behrens

Attorney at Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

2029 Century Park East, 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

39 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

18 #1

Proposed Order

6 #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement

6 #1

Declaration of Theodore E. Tsekerides

#6

1 #28

Docket Report - Part 23

1 #27

Docket Report - Part 22

1 #26

Docket Report - Part 21

1 #25

Docket Report - Part 20

1 #24

Docket Report - Part 19

1 #23

Docket Report - Part 18

1 #22

Docket Report - Part 17

1 #21

Docket Report - Part 16

1 #8

Docket Report - Part 3

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Reorganized Debtors' Response to Appellant's Statement of Issues and Designation of Record on Appeal re #27 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit (Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 1/19/2021) Modified on 1/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Appellant's Statement of Issues and Designation of Record on Appeal re #27 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit (Murphy, Bennett) (Filed on 1/7/2021) Modified on 1/8/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) USCA Case Number 21-15025 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #27 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Canyon Capital Advisors LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Canyon Capital Advisors LLC. Appeal of Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, Order on Motion to Dismiss #26 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-15372647 paid.) (Murphy, Bennett) (Filed on 12/28/2020) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #6 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING #18 MOTION TO RESET HEARING. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Submission Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8014(f re #14 Appellee's Brief) by PG&E Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Cuker Decision)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/11/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Appellant's REPLY BRIEF (Murphy, Bennett) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE TO SUBMISSION PURSUANT TO FED.R.BANKR.P.8014(f) re #16 Statement, filed by Canyon Capital Advisors LLC. (Murphy, Bennett) (Filed on 11/4/2020) Modified on 11/5/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 29, 2020 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Canyon Capital Advisors LLC, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Izakelian, Razmig) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Reset Hearing on Reorganized Debtors' Motion To Dismiss ) filed byPG&E Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appellant's BRIEF Appellee Brief due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appellant's Appendix of Documents Part I, #2 Appendix Appellant's Appendix of Documents Part II, #3 Appendix Appellant's Appendix of Additional Authorities)(Murphy, Bennett) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Rescheduling Hearing on Motion to Dismiss re #6 Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss Appeal by Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC filed by PG&E Corporation. Responses due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore E. Tsekerides, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Reorganized Debtors' Motion to Dismiss Appeal by Canyon Capital Advisors, LLC filed by PG&E Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/25/2020. Replies due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theodore E. Tsekerides, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RECEIPT OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL in PDF Format: Record on Appeal Received and Attached at the Request of the Court re appeal #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record, #2 Record on Appeal Documents)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) ***DISREGARD, E-FILED IN THE WRONG CASE** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2020. Total Time in Court: 21 Minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney: Avi Kaufman. Defendant Attorney: Esteban Morales Fabila. Plaintiffs unopposed motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement (docket no. 69 ) is argued by the parties. Parties are directed to meet and confer and e-file by August 6th 1) a stipulated proposed revision to release language in the settlement agreement and 2) further detail regarding the policies and procedures that constitute injunctive relief for the class members. The motion will be deemed submitted upon receipt of the August 6th filings. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ndrS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Jennifer Nassiri. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Ca nyon Capital Advisors LLC). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Bennett Murphy. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Cany on Capital Advisors LLC). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number USBC, San Francisco, 19-30088. File received. Filed by Canyon Capital Advisors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Memorandum Decision, #3 Order Confirming Ch. 11 Plan, #4 Certificate of Service of Jennifer Nassiri, #5 Court Certificate of Mailing, #6 Docket Report - Part 1, #7 Docket Report - Part 2, #8 Docket Report - Part 3, #9 Docket Report - Part 4, #10 Docket Report - Part 5, #11 Docket Report - Part 6, #12 Docket Report - Part 7, #13 Docket Report - Part 8, #14 Docket Report - Part 9, #15 Docket Report - Part 10, #16 Docket Report - Part 11, #17 Docket Report - Part 12, #18 Docket Report - Part 13, #19 Docket Report - Part 14, #20 Docket Report - Part 15, #21 Docket Report - Part 16, #22 Docket Report - Part 17, #23 Docket Report - Part 18, #24 Docket Report - Part 19, #25 Docket Report - Part 20, #26 Docket Report - Part 21, #27 Docket Report - Part 22, #28 Docket Report - Part 23)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PG&E CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Canyon Capital Advisors LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Omid H. Nasab

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared R Friedmann