This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2022 at 10:22:46 (UTC).

Emely Canut v. Compass Group USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 Emely Canut filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Compass Group USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01829

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMELY CANUT

Defendants

Compass Group USA, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay S Rothman

Timothy E Kearns

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Ann Brody

Lonnie D Giamela

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION by Judge John F. Walter, re Stipulation #17 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The matter of Emely Canut v. Compass Group USA, Inc., et al., United States District Court for the Central District of California Case 2:22-CV-01829-JFW-KS shall be submitted to binding arbitration (see document for further details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

17 #1

Proposed Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Submit Plaintiff's Claims to Bindin

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on April 25, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. If counsel fail to cooperate in the preparation of the required Pre-Trial documents, fail to file the required Pre-Trial documents, or fail to appear at the Pre-Trial Conference and such failure is not otherwise satisfactorily explained to the Court: (a) the cause shall stand dismissed for failure to prosecute if such failure occurs on the part of the plaintiff; (b) default judgment shall be entered if such failure occurs on the part of the defendant; or (c) the Court may take such action as it deems appropriate. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#14

(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc... (Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Jay S. Rothman re Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Emely Canut. (Rothman, Jay) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of Timothy E. Kearns re Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Emely Canut. (Rothman, Jay) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., a DELAWARE Corporation identifying Compass Group PLC, a British public limited company as Corporate Parent. (Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.'s CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., a DELAWARE Corporation, (Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., a DELAWARE Corporation. (Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

1 #2

Declaration Declaration of Stephanie Smith ISO Removal

1 #1

Declaration Declaration of Jennifer A. Brody ISO Removal

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION by Judge John F. Walter, re Stipulation #17 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The matter of Emely Canut v. Compass Group USA, Inc., et al., United States District Court for the Central District of California Case 2:22-CV-01829-JFW-KS shall be submitted to binding arbitration (see document for further details). (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint STIPULATION for Leave to Submit Plaintiff's Claims to Binding Arbitration filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Joint Stipulation to Submit Plaintiff's Claims to Binding Arbitration)(Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on April 25, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. If counsel fail to cooperate in the preparation of the required Pre-Trial documents, fail to file the required Pre-Trial documents, or fail to appear at the Pre-Trial Conference and such failure is not otherwise satisfactorily explained to the Court: (a) the cause shall stand dismissed for failure to prosecute if such failure occurs on the part of the plaintiff; (b) default judgment shall be entered if such failure occurs on the part of the defendant; or (c) the Court may take such action as it deems appropriate. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc... (Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DECLARATION of Jay S. Rothman re Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Emely Canut. (Rothman, Jay) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Timothy E. Kearns re Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Emely Canut. (Rothman, Jay) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (FILED IN STATE COURT (3/17/2022) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT C TO NOTICE #11 .) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by D(iv) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conformed Summons & Complaint, Notice of Case Assignment and Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Case Management Conference, #3 Exhibit C - Conformed Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Lonnie D. Giamela re Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Giamela, Lonnie) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Emely Canut, upon Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. served on 2/16/2022, answer due 3/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koy Saechao, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/17/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Compass Group USA, Inc., Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Emely Canut. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/14/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., a DELAWARE Corporation identifying Compass Group PLC, a British public limited company as Corporate Parent. (Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.'s CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., a DELAWARE Corporation, (Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., a DELAWARE Corporation. (Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV05566 Receipt No: ACACDC-32975780 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., a DELAWARE Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer A. Brody ISO Removal, #2 Declaration Declaration of Stephanie Smith ISO Removal) (Attorney Jennifer Ann Brody added to party COMPASS GROUP USA, INC., a DELAWARE Corporation(pty:dft))(Brody, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less