This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:18:26 (UTC).

Canty et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Canty filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are David H. Hennessy and Timothy S. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-12472

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David H. Hennessy

Timothy S. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kim Canty

John Canty

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam T. Sherwin

Attorney at The Sherwin Law Firm

529 Main Street, Suite 200

Charlestown, MA 02129

Defendant Attorneys

Edward James Mikolinski

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP - MA

One Lincoln Street, State Street Financial Center

Boston, MA 02111-2950

Sean R. Higgins

Attorney at K & L Gates LLP - MA

One Lincoln Street, State Street Financial Center

Boston, MA 02111-2950

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/14/20 to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by John Canty, Kim Canty.(Sherwin, Adam) Modified on 1/28/2020 (Castles, Martin). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

18 #16

Exhibit P

18 #12

Exhibit L

18 #11

Exhibit K

18 #9

Exhibit I

18 #8

Exhibit H

18 #7

Exhibit G

18 #1

Exhibit A

#17

(#17) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#8

(#11) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 1/3/2020. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward James Mikolinski on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mikolinski, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #5

Category Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Revised Demand

1 #2

Exhibit B - Chapter 93A Demand Letter

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8002475 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Chapter 93A Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Revised Demand, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response due by 2/14/2020. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/14/20 to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by John Canty, Kim Canty.(Sherwin, Adam) Modified on 1/28/2020 (Castles, Martin). (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATE COURT Record. (Mikolinski, Edward) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to File State Court Record late.(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to File State Court Record Late (Unopposed) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Mikolinski, Edward) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 1/17/2020. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 17, 2020 to File Response to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Mikolinski, Edward) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Castles, Martin). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 1/3/2020. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Sherwin, Adam) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/3/20 to Respond to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Mikolinski, Edward) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#7) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 12/6/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-12472. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward James Mikolinski on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mikolinski, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8002475 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Chapter 93A Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Revised Demand, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.