This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/16/2019 at 07:33:27 (UTC).

CANTWELL v. AECOM C&E, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 CANTWELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AECOM C E, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David S. Cercone and Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01325

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David S. Cercone

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS CANTWELL

Defendants

AECOM CONSULT, INC.

AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC.

ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10)

AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

URS CORPORATION

AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC.

AECOM POWER E&C, INC.

AECOM SERVICES, INC.

AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC.

AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC

AECOM C&E, INC.

AECOM USA, INC.

AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC

AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC.

AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.

URS CORPORATION SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brad D. Trust

Attorney at Edgar Snyder & Associates, LLC

U.S. Steel Tower, 10Th Floor, 600 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Robert J. Mongeluzzi

Attorney at Saltz, Mongeluzzi, Barrett & Bendesky

1650 Market Street, 34Th Floor, One Liberty Place

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7301

Robert J. Fisher, Jr.

Attorney at Edgar Snyder & Associates

600 Grant Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Elizabeth A. Bailey

Attorney at Saltz, Mongeluzzi, Barrett & Bendesky, P.C.

1650 Market Street, 52Nd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David L. Kwass

Attorney at Saltz, Mongeluzzi, Barrett & Bendesky, P.C.

1650 Market St., 52 Fl.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Joseph Coles

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

501 Grant Street, Suite 850

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Kevin M. Eddy

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

501 Grant Street, Suite 805

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Ricky M Guerra

Attorney at Blank Rome

130 N. 18Th Street, One Logan Square

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have an extension up to and including 1/15/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/29/2019. (jgb) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AECOM USA, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coles, Amy) Modified text on 11/29/2019. (jmm) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/1/2019. (jgb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketJudge Marilyn J. Horan added. (mao) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/23/2019. (kly) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/23/2019) (kly) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ricky M Guerra on behalf of AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Guerra, Ricky) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by URS CORPORATION, AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM USA, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM C&E, INC., URS CORPORATION SERVICES, AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC Answer due from URS CORPORATION on 12/6/2019; AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC on 12/6/2019; AECOM USA, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM CONSULT, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM POWER E&C, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM C&E, INC. on 12/6/2019; URS CORPORATION SERVICES on 12/6/2019; AECOM SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC on 12/6/2019. (Coles, Amy) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Coles, Amy) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Eddy on behalf of AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Eddy, Kevin) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-011788 with Jury Demand Copies attached: Complaint, Declaration of Kenneth W. Martinez, Cover Sheet and Complaint, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Declaration of Maymond Boyd Rowles II, Inspection Detail, Docket Sheet, Routers Article, Motion to Conduct Rule 2004 Discovery (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5321244), filed by URS CORPORATION, AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM USA, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10), AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM C&E, INC., URS CORPORATION SERVICES, AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9) (jm) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AECOM CONSULT, INC. is a litigant