This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2019 at 07:55:08 (UTC).

Cantrell v. Baker et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Cantrell filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Baker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian S. Miller and Joe J. Volpe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

Referral Judge

Joe J. Volpe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimmy Shane Cantrell

Newport, AR 72112

Defendants

Baker

Daniel Golden

Wendy Kelley

Lynn Bennett

Mullins

Lennon Hardy

Raylina Ramsey

Brian S Miller

J T Kearney

Steven Ricketts

Nicholas Wolff

Maurice Culclager

Joe J Volpe

Gary Musselwhite

Billy Roy Wilson

John Does

Lyn Bennett

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendations by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (kdr) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice #2 . The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting this recommendation and the accompany judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/15/2019. (lej) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying Plaintiff's IFP Application pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) #1 . Plaintiff must submit to the Clerk the statutory filing fee of $400, in full, within 21 days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/20/2019. (lej) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Immediate Temporary Restraining Order by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (ljb) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (ljb) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Immediate Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (kdr) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees is held in abeyance #1 . If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/5/2019. (lej) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jimmy Shane Cantrell.(kdr) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (kdr) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendations by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (kdr) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice #2 . The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting this recommendation and the accompany judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/15/2019. (lej) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER denying Plaintiff's IFP Application pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) #1 . Plaintiff must submit to the Clerk the statutory filing fee of $400, in full, within 21 days of the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/20/2019. (lej) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for TRO #7 . Plaintiff is currently housed at the Tucker Unit and his emergency motion raises new and unrelated allegations that occurred previously at the Grimes Unit. Therefore, Plaintiff's motion for "immediate" relief "to prevent further irreparable harm" is frivolous and should be denied on that basis alone. I also note that Plaintiff is a "three striker" and has neither paid the requisite filing fee nor shown how he qualifies to proceed in forma pauperis in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/20/2019. (lej) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Immediate Temporary Restraining Order by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (ljb) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (ljb) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER because Plaintiff is a three-striker with an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis that has been held in abeyance until he provides more information to the Court, his motions for a temporary restraining order, show cause, and/or preliminary injunction are denied as premature #4 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/10/2019. (lej) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Immediate Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (kdr) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees is held in abeyance #1 . If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/5/2019. (lej) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jimmy Shane Cantrell.(kdr) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy Shane Cantrell. (kdr) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less