This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2021 at 10:32:20 (UTC).

CANON INC. v. STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 CANON INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. SCHROEDER

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANON INC.

Defendant

STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW L. RODENBOUGH

Attorney at BROOKS PIERCE MCLENDON HUMPHREY & LEONARD, LLP

Pob 26000

Greensboro, NC 27420-6000

Defendant Attorneys

ANDREW S. CHAMBERLIN

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

Pob 2752

Greensboro, NC 27402

DIXIE THOMAS WELLS

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

Pob 2752

Greensboro, NC 27402

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

#6

5 #1

Consent Form

#5

#4

#2

1 #7

Exhibit 033 Patent Claim Chart

1 #6

Exhibit 032 Patent Claim Chart

1 #3

Exhibit 061 Patent Claim Chart

1 #2

Exhibit 060 Patent Claim Chart

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 4/15/2021; that the motion to stay is GRANTED, and this case and all deadlines in this action are STAYED pending a final determination, no longer subject to appeal, in the related proceeding before the U.S. International Trade Commission, In the Matter of Certain Toner Supply Containers and Components Thereof (I), Investigation No. 337-TA-1259. The clerk of court may administratively close this file in the interim. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #10 MOTION to Stay Pending U.S. International Trade Commission Investigation. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC. re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending U.S. International Trade Commission Investigation filed by STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC.. (CHAMBERLIN, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Stay Pending U.S. International Trade Commission Investigation by STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 5/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAMBERLIN, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 4/9/2021. The Consent Motion (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED, and the time within which SCC may respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including June 28, 2021. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Engle, Anita) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS on behalf of Defendant STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC. (WELLS, DIXIE) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHAMBERLIN, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC. served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. (RODENBOUGH, ANDREW) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CANON INC.. (RODENBOUGH, ANDREW) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3001877.), filed by CANON INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 667 Patent Claim Chart, #2 Exhibit 060 Patent Claim Chart, #3 Exhibit 061 Patent Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit 957 Patent Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit 814 Patent Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit 032 Patent Claim Chart, #7 Exhibit 033 Patent Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit 654 Patent Claim Chart, #9 Exhibit 881 Patent Claim Chart, #10 Exhibit 882 Patent Claim Chart)(RODENBOUGH, ANDREW) Modified on 3/8/2021 to correct that complaint is against defendant. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATIC CONTROL COMPONENTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Canon, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW S. CHAMBERLIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dixie Thomas Wells