This case was last updated from PACER on 05/07/2021 at 08:11:54 (UTC).

Canon Inc. v. NAR Cartridges

Case Summary

On March 08, 2021, Canon Inc. (“Canon” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Sarah Sheldon Brooks of Venable LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against NAR Cartridges (“Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged patent infringement. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge Vince Chhabria presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this case for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 10,209,667, titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,”(the “’667 patent”), 10,289,060, titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,” (the “’060 patent”), 10,289,061 titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,” (the “’061 patent”), 10,295,957 titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,” (the “’957 patent”), 10,488,814 titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,” (the “’814 patent”), 10,496,032 titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,” (the “’032 patent”), 10,496,033 titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,” (the “’033 patent”), 10,514,654 titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,” (the “’654 patent”), 10,520,881 titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,” (the “’881 patent”) and 10,520,882 titled “Developer Supply Container and Developer Supplying System,” (the “’882 patent”), duly and legally issued to Canon as assignee of the inventors, Manabu Jimba, Ayatomo Okino, Katsuya Murakami, Toshiaki Nagashima, and Fumio Tazawa. (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”). 

 

The Plaintiff stated that “this action is related to an action being concurrently filed in the U.S. International Trade Commission, In the Matter of Certain Toner Supply Containers and Components Thereof (the “ITC Proceeding”)”.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that “Defendant is engaged in the business of selling and/or offering to sell within the United States and/or importing into the United States toner supply containers (hereinafter, “Accused Products”) for use in one or more Canon copy machines, … which toner supply containers are covered by one or more claims of each of the Asserted Patents.”

 

There are ten claims for relief laid down by Cannon, one for the infringement of each of the Asserted Patents wherein it has been alleged that the Defendant has directly infringed and is directly infringing one or more claims of the Asserted Patents by selling and/or offering to sell within the United States and/or importing into the United States Accused Products embodying the invention defined by one or more claims of the Asserted Patents without authority of Canon. Plaintiff further alleged that the Defendant also is indirectly infringing the Asserted Patents at least by virtue of its inducement of direct infringement of that patent by customers who use Defendant’s Accused Products in at least the Canon copy machines listed in the complaint.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order for preliminary and permanent injunction against the Defendant and its subsidiaries, affiliates, officers, directors, agents, servants, employees, successors, and assigns, and all other persons and organizations in active concert or participation with them to prevent further acts of alleged infringement of the Asserted Patents pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 283. The Plaintiff further requested the court to award damages adequate to compensate Canon for Defendant’s alleged infringement of the Asserted Patents pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284, including lost profits and/or a reasonable royalty, together with interest in addition to the costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01646

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Canon Inc.

Defendant

NAR Cartridges

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah Sheldon Brooks

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

#15

#14

#13

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

9 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION, CONSENT JUDGMENT, AND PERMANENTINJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/30/2021. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Canon Inc. NOTICE OF LODGING OF JOINT STIPULATION, CONSENT JUDGMENT, AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 4/23/2021) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION re #13 Certificate of Service, #1 Complaint filed by Canon Inc.. (Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 4/13/2021) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Canon Inc. (Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 3/29/2021) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Canon Inc. re #1 Complaint (Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#12) REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: b> Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, June 3, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Canon Inc... (Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to NAR Cartridges. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/23/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Canon Inc. re #1 Complaint (Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NAR Cartridges ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15672546.). Filed byCanon Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Sarah) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Canon, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah S Brooks