Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2021 at 07:39:56 (UTC).

Cannuscio et al v. GEICO Advantage Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Cannuscio filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00613

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kevin O'Donnell

Carlo Cannuscio

Defendants

Geico General Insurance Company

GEICO Choice Insurance Company

GEICO Secure Insurance Company

GEICO Casualty Company

GEICO Advantage Insurance Company

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cassandra Cummings

Attorney at Eglet Adams

400 S. 7Th Street, Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Matthew L. Sharp

Attorney at Matthew L. Sharp, Ltd.

432 Ridge St.

Reno, NV 89501

Robert T Eglet

Attorney at Eglet Prince

400 S. 7Th Street, Box 1, Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Damon N. Vocke

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036-4086

Daniel B Heidtke

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 North City Parkway, Suite 1560

Las Vegas, NV 89106

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs Carlo Cannuscio, Kevin O'Donnell. (Sharp, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Heidtke, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/14/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/29/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-829886-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6447288) by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Heidtke, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs Carlo Cannuscio, Kevin O'Donnell. (Sharp, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Geico General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Heidtke, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/14/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/29/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-829886-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6447288) by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Heidtke, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO Secure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Choice Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Geico Advantage Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant