Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/20/2021 at 13:00:14 (UTC).

Cannon v. ABM Aviation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Cannon filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ABM Aviation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Ray, II and Christopher C. Bly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05178

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DuVal Cannon

Clarkston, GA 30021

Defendant

ABM Aviation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Schultz

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3424 Peachtree Rd, Ne, Ste 1200

Atlanta, GA 30326

Owen Tai Hill

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3424 Peachtree Road, N.E., Ste 1200

Atlanta, GA 30326-1127

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by ABM Aviation, Inc..(Schultz, Eric) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by ABM Aviation, Inc..(Schultz, Eric) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#13

(#13) Initial Disclosures by DuVal Cannon.(rjs) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Guidelines for Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/10/2021. (cmd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 5/28/2021. Motions due by 6/28/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due 40 days after the close of discovery or, if MSJs filed, 30 days after the District Judge's final ruling, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/9/2021. (cmd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by ABM Aviation, Inc..(Hill, Owen) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#7

(#7) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#6

(#6) OBJECTION re #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), by DuVal Cannon. (ah) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#5

(#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Hill, Owen) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#4

(#4) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Claim by ABM Aviation, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/28/2021.(Hill, Owen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified to edit text on 12/30/2020 (ah). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM Aviation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ABM Industries Incorporated for ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Hill, Owen) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#2

(#2) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing Removal

1 #1

Exhibit -A -State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10520647) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/28/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by ABM Aviation, Inc..(Schultz, Eric) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by ABM Aviation, Inc..(Schultz, Eric) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Initial Disclosures by DuVal Cannon.(rjs) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to DuVal Cannon re #10 Order. (cmd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Guidelines for Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/10/2021. (cmd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to DuVal Cannon re #9 Scheduling Order. (cmd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 5/28/2021. Motions due by 6/28/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due 40 days after the close of discovery or, if MSJs filed, 30 days after the District Judge's final ruling, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/9/2021. (cmd) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re Clerks Certificate of Mailing. Modified to link to correct document. (adg) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to DuVal Cannon re #7 Notice (Other). (adg) Modified on 1/28/2021 to link to correct document(adg). (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by ABM Aviation, Inc..(Hill, Owen) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OBJECTION re #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), by DuVal Cannon. (ah) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Hill, Owen) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Affirmative and Other Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Claim by ABM Aviation, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/28/2021.(Hill, Owen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified to edit text on 12/30/2020 (ah). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM Aviation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ABM Industries Incorporated for ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Hill, Owen) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to DuVal Cannon re #2 Order. (eop) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10520647) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owen Tai Hill