Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 11:00:00 (UTC).

CANNON v 3M COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 CANNON filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00814

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS CANNON

Defendant

3M COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yvonne M Flaherty

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP

100 Washington Ave S Ste 2200

Mpls, MN 55401-2179

SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON

Attorney at CLARK LOVE & HUTSON GP - HOUSTON TX

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND

Attorney at CLARK LOVE & HUTSON GP - HOUSTON TX

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

CLAYTON A CLARK

Attorney at CLARK LOVE & HUTSON GP - HOUSTON TX

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

SCOTT A LOVE

Attorney at CLARK LOVE & HUTSON GP - HOUSTON TX

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN W HULSE

Attorney at Blackwell Burke PA

431 S 7Th St Ste 2500

Mpls, MN 55415

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON on behalf of THOMAS CANNON (HUTSON, SHELLEY) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND on behalf of THOMAS CANNON (MORELAND, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A LOVE on behalf of THOMAS CANNON (LOVE, SCOTT) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by CLAYTON A CLARK on behalf of THOMAS CANNON (CLARK, CLAYTON) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00751. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00732-JRT-KMM et al.(JME) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Thomas Cannon. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-751 JRT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge David S. Doty, Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/20/2019. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/22/19.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6743934) filed by Thomas Cannon. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 03/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by SHELLEY VAN NATTER HUTSON on behalf of THOMAS CANNON (HUTSON, SHELLEY) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM MICHAEL MORELAND on behalf of THOMAS CANNON (MORELAND, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A LOVE on behalf of THOMAS CANNON (LOVE, SCOTT) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by CLAYTON A CLARK on behalf of THOMAS CANNON (CLARK, CLAYTON) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00751. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00732-JRT-KMM et al.(JME) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2019
  • (#7) (Text-only) ORDER STAYING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these proceedings are stayed in their entirety, including, without limitation, Defendant's obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, until such time as the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this matter will be transferred to an MDL and, if so, in what jurisdiction. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/13/2019. (KAT) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 04/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Thomas Cannon. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-751 JRT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Paul A. Magnuson, Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Judge David S. Doty, Judge Nancy E. Brasel, Judge Susan Richard Nelson, and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/20/2019. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/22/19.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Clayton A. Clark, Scott A. Love, W. Michael Moreland as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-751 PAM/DTS. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 3M Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6743934) filed by Thomas Cannon. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Yvonne) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin W Hulse