This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 07:58:08 (UTC).

Cannon et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Cannon filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Tafoya and William J. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03138

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kathleen M. Tafoya

William J. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ralph Cannon

Lannita Cannon

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Martin Roth

Attorney at Roth Milne

950 South Cherry Street, Suite 416

Denver, CO 80246

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Rosenfield

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Holly C. White

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Brian John Spano

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (White, Holly) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Rosenfield on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney David M. Rosenfield added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Rosenfield, David) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America All parties do not consent.. (White, Holly) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Holly C. White added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 1/19/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/19/2022. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/29/2021. (evaug ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, and Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Safeco Insurance Company of America on 11/1/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Safeco Insurance Company of America, filed by Ralph Cannon, Lannita Cannon.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Main Document

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice to State Court

1 #3

Exhibit C - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - Return of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03138-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (White, Holly) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Rosenfield on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney David M. Rosenfield added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Rosenfield, David) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America All parties do not consent.. (White, Holly) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Holly C. White added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 1/19/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/19/2022. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/29/2021. (evaug ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Martin Roth on behalf of Lannita Cannon, Ralph CannonAttorney David Martin Roth added to party Lannita Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney David Martin Roth added to party Ralph Cannon(pty:pla) (Roth, David) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, and Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Safeco Insurance Company of America on 11/1/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Safeco Insurance Company of America, filed by Ralph Cannon, Lannita Cannon.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Records by Defendant SAFECO Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAFECO Insurance Company of America from El Paso County, Case Number 21CV31753. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8189098), filed by SAFECO Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to State Court, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet)(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holly C. White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian John Spano