This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2023 at 09:07:33 (UTC).

Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated et al v Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-08247

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated

CCMSI

Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company

Defendants

Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated

Kristina Jansky

Brittany Chavers

James F Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy Wilkins Hoffman

Defendant Attorneys

Kira Nicole Barrett

Kyle Taylor Geiger

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER: (Doc. 13 in case 3:22-cv-08222-JJT) Motion to Consolidate Cases is granted. The Clerk shall transfer CV-22-8247-PCT-SMB to the Honorable John J. Tuchi for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall consolidate Case Nos. CV-22-08247-PCT-SMB and CV-22-08222-PCT-JJT with CV-22-08222-PCT-JJT as the lead case. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-22-08222-PCT-JJT and shall be filed only in the lead case. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/22/2023. (Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-08222-JJT, 3:22-cv-08247-SMB) (CLM) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Brittany Chavers, Kristina Jansky, James F Johnson.(Geiger, Kyle) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

14 #2

Consent Form

14 #1

Instructions

14 #14

Main Document

13 #2

Consent Form

13 #1

Instructions

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent CCMSI Holdings, Inc. for Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated. (Hoffman, Amy) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Delaware Life Insurance Company for Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Hoffman, Amy) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

13 #1

Proposed Order Order

13 #20

Main Document

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated.(Geiger, Kyle) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

1 #4

Verification

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: (Doc. 13 in case 3:22-cv-08222-JJT) Motion to Consolidate Cases is granted. The Clerk shall transfer CV-22-8247-PCT-SMB to the Honorable John J. Tuchi for all further proceedings. The Clerk shall consolidate Case Nos. CV-22-08247-PCT-SMB and CV-22-08222-PCT-JJT with CV-22-08222-PCT-JJT as the lead case. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-22-08222-PCT-JJT and shall be filed only in the lead case. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/22/2023. (Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-08222-JJT, 3:22-cv-08247-SMB) (CLM) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated, Brittany Chavers, Kristina Jansky, James F Johnson, Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Associated Cases: cv-22-08247-SMB, cv-22-08222-JJT) (Geiger, Kyle) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-22-8247-PCT-SMB. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for February 6, 2023 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket(#17) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Brittany Chavers, Kristina Jansky, James F Johnson.(Geiger, Kyle) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#19) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDERED that Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDERED that Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent CCMSI Holdings, Inc. for Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated. (Hoffman, Amy) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Delaware Life Insurance Company for Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Hoffman, Amy) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated.(Geiger, Kyle) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated. (Geiger, Kyle) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated. (Geiger, Kyle) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER: Due to Clerical Error, this case was originally opened in the incorrect year; now opened correctly as case number: CV-22-8247-PCT-DMF. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated, Cannon Cochran Management Service Incorporated, Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (SCA) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new removal case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21450537. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-08247-PCT-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (SCA) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Yavapai County Superior Court, case number P1300CV202200783. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21450537 filed by Bill Davis Trucking Incorporated. (Barrett, Kira) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Verification)(SCA) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less