This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2019 at 07:07:59 (UTC).

Cannata v. Harris & Harris, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Cannata filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Harris Harris, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04231

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra L. Cannata

Defendant

Harris & Harris, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Omar Tayseer Sulaiman

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Marwan R. Daher

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Alexander James Taylor

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Brandon S. Stein

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendant Harris & Harris, Ltd. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (UNOPPOSED) (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sandra L. Cannata; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15962042. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sandra L. Cannata by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion for initial enlargement of time to file responsive pleading #10 is granted to 8/21/2019. No appearance required on 8/12/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra L. Cannata as to Harris & Harris, Ltd. on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Motion by Brandon S. Stein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/12/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#5

(#5) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Sandra L. Cannata regarding complaint #1 (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harris & Harris, Ltd. by Brandon S. Stein (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sandra L. Cannata by Marwan R. Daher (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 9/27/2019. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#14

(#14) STATUS Report (JOINT) by Harris & Harris, Ltd. (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harris & Harris, Ltd. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sandra L. Cannata by Alexander James Taylor (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STATUS Report (JOINT) by Harris & Harris, Ltd. (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion for initial enlargement of time to file responsive pleading #10 is granted to 8/21/2019. No appearance required on 8/12/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harris & Harris, Ltd. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Motion by Brandon S. Stein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/12/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION by Defendant Harris & Harris, Ltd. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (UNOPPOSED) (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Harris & Harris, Ltd. by Brandon S. Stein (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 9/27/2019. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra L. Cannata as to Harris & Harris, Ltd. on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Harris & Harris, Ltd. (ec, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Sandra L. Cannata regarding complaint #1 (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sandra L. Cannata by Alexander James Taylor (Taylor, Alexander) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sandra L. Cannata by Marwan R. Daher (Daher, Marwan) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sandra L. Cannata by Omar Tayseer Sulaiman (Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sandra L. Cannata; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15962042. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sulaiman, Omar) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.