This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2021 at 08:23:55 (UTC).

CANN v. THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 CANN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. BARCLAY SURRICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06126

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. BARCLAY SURRICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAIMAH CANN

Defendant

THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA doing business as PENN MEDICINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT H. GRAFF

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A. SHORE, P.C.

1500 Jfk Blvd, Suite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NAIMAH CANN. THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA waiver sent on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14758752.), filed by NAIMAH CANN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NAIMAH CANN. THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA waiver sent on 12/4/2020, answer due 2/2/2021. (GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/4/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by NAIMAH CANN. (fb) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14758752.), filed by NAIMAH CANN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA doing business as PENNSYLVANIA MEDICAL CENTER - HOSPITAL OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT H. GRAFF