This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 07:59:07 (UTC).

Cann v. Monsanto Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Cann filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00306

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John M Cann

Defendants

Monsanto Company

Bayer Corporation

Bayer A.G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph A Mooneyham

Attorney at Mooneyham Berry LLC

Po Box 8359, 1225 S Church Street

Greenville, SC 29604

Defendant Attorney

Jennise Walker-Stubbs

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10251470.), filed by John M Cann. Service due by 3/23/2022(alew, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John M Cann.(alew, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Summons Bayer Corporation

4 #2

Summons Bayer AG c/o Bayer Corporation

#6

(#6) Case transferred to Northern District of California per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 307. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (alew, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

7 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/24/2022) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/24/2022) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/24/2022) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#11

(#11) Bayer Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] byBayer Corporation. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Bayer Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Bayer Corporation. [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Bayer Corporation. [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Bayer Corporation. [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Bayer Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Bayer Corporation. [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Bayer Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] byBayer Corporation. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/25/2022) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/24/2022) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/24/2022) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff John M. Cann] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 1/24/2022) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; District of South Carolina, 8:21-cv-04135-MDL Cann v. Monsanto Company, et al., opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-00306-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 307 cc: JPMDL (wsn-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 8:21-cv-04135. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred to Northern District of California per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 307. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (alew, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bayer Corporation, #2 Summons Bayer AG c/o Bayer Corporation)(alew, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John M Cann.(alew, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10251470.), filed by John M Cann. Service due by 3/23/2022(alew, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayer AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayer Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennise Walker-Stubbs