This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2020 at 08:09:00 (UTC).

CANFIELD et al v. TAPESTRY, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 CANFIELD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TAPESTRY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CHAD F. KENNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03773

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHAD F. KENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BETH CANFIELD

RICHARD CANFIELD

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TAPESTRY, INC. D/B/A COACH

JOHN DOE

SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC.

Defendant and Cross Claimant

SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES P MALONEY, IV

Attorney at GOLDBERG GOLDBERG & JANOSKI

213-215 West Miner Street

West Chester, PA 19382

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MARK A. SALOMAN

Attorney at FORD HARRISON LLP

300 Connell Dr Suite 4100

Bereley Heights, NJ 07922

MICHAEL S. BOGDANOFF

Attorney at GEKOSKI AND BOGDANOFF, P.C.

215 S. Broad St Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19107-5318

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

MICHAEL S. BOGDANOFF

Attorney at GEKOSKI AND BOGDANOFF, P.C.

215 S. Broad St Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19107-5318

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT REFERRAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL - MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY. 09/30/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. (miah,) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER AS FOLLOWS THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR THE SCHEDULING OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONTACT JUDGE HEYS CHAMBERS BEFORE THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY, JANUARY 8, 2021; DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/19/2021. MOTIONS DUE BY 4/23/2021. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 4/23/2021. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/7/2021. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/7/2021. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 6/25/2021 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/30/20. 9/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#13

(#13) Defendant Tapestry's ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Simon Property Group, Inc. by TAPESTRY, INC..(SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#12

(#12) Report Of Parties' Rule 26(f) Meeting by TAPESTRY, INC.. (SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER THAT INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/30/2020 09:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/8/20. 9/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against TAPESTRY, INC. by SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. Affirmative Defenses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BOGDANOFF, MICHAEL) Modified on 9/10/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDERED AND DECREED THAT DEFENDANT SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. SHALL HAVE UNTIL SEPTEMBER 10, 2020 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/24/20. 8/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL S. BOGDANOFF on behalf of SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. (BOGDANOFF, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by TAPESTRY, INC..(SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/6/20. 8/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TAPESTRY, INC..(SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by TAPESTRY, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney) Notice to Adverse Parties (SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TAPESTRY, INC. , COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 200600614, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14467758), filed by TAPESTRY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(SALOMAN, MARK) Modified on 8/4/2020 (tjd). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/4/2020) (tjd, ). (Entered: 08/03/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 6/7/2021. (tjd) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT REFERRAL NOTICE TO COUNSEL - MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY. 09/30/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. (miah,) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER AS FOLLOWS THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR THE SCHEDULING OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONTACT JUDGE HEYS CHAMBERS BEFORE THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY, JANUARY 8, 2021; DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/19/2021. MOTIONS DUE BY 4/23/2021. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 4/23/2021. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/7/2021. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/7/2021. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 6/25/2021 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/30/20. 9/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant Tapestry's ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Simon Property Group, Inc. by TAPESTRY, INC..(SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Report Of Parties' Rule 26(f) Meeting by TAPESTRY, INC.. (SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#11) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER THAT INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/30/2020 09:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/8/20. 9/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against TAPESTRY, INC. by SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. Affirmative Defenses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BOGDANOFF, MICHAEL) Modified on 9/10/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDERED AND DECREED THAT DEFENDANT SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. SHALL HAVE UNTIL SEPTEMBER 10, 2020 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/24/20. 8/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL S. BOGDANOFF on behalf of SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. (BOGDANOFF, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by TAPESTRY, INC..(SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/6/20. 8/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TAPESTRY, INC..(SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by TAPESTRY, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney) Notice to Adverse Parties (SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal (Attorney) by MARK A. SALOMAN on behalf of TAPESTRY, INC.(SALOMAN, MARK) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TAPESTRY, INC. , COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 200600614, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14467758), filed by TAPESTRY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(SALOMAN, MARK) Modified on 8/4/2020 (tjd). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/4/2020) (tjd, ). (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAPESTRY INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Simon Property Goup LP is a litigant