This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 09:53:38 (UTC).

Candelaria v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Candelaria filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are James O. Browning and Gregory B. Wormuth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00730

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James O. Browning

Referral Judge

Gregory B. Wormuth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Ellen Candelaria

Defendants

American Medical Systems, Inc.

American Medical System Holdings, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rachel Montes

Attorney at Montes Law Group, PC

1121 Kinwest Parkway, Suite 100

Irving, TX 75063

Defendant Attorneys

Lora Spencer

Attorney at Reed Smith

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Erica R. Neff

Attorney at O'Brien & Padilla PC

6000 Indian School Road Ne, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

 

Court Documents

#17

16 #2

Exhibit B-MDL Court's PTO_Doc 171

16 #1

Exhibit A-MDL Court's PTO_Doc 15

16 #16

Main Document

#14

#13

#10

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D - Jury Demand

1 #3

Exhibit C - Complaint & Summons v Astora Women's

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint & Summons v Endo Pharm

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Docket

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Neff, Erica) Modified text on 9/28/2021 (bap). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-MDL Court's PTO_Doc 15, #2 Exhibit B-MDL Court's PTO_Doc 171) (Neff, Erica) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 11. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER VACATING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (emm) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR*** ORDER VACATING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (emm) Modified text on 9/16/2021 add error language due to document not attached. To be refiled (gr). (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal of Party by American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Neff, Erica) Modified text to correct title on 9/17/2021 (bap). (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#12) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United Staes Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2021 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461 to be connected to the proceedings.Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/7/2021. (ceo) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendants ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Neff, Erica) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica R. Neff on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc. (Neff, Erica) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7825319 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Neff, Erica) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#6) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. by Erica R. Neff on behalf of: Lora Spencer Reed Smith, LLP 811 Main Street, Suite 1700Houston, TX 77002 (215) 241-7995 Fax (215) 851-1420 lspencer@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Neff, Erica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Filing of Defendants' Notice of Removal (Neff, Erica) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Neff, Erica) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (arp) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketOffice code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7821902 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Neff, Erica) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Systems, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate American Medical Systems, Inc. for American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Neff, Erica) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Medical Systems, Inc. from State of NM Fifth Judicial District, case number D-504-CV-2021-00455. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint & Summons v Endo Pharm, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint & Summons v Astora Women's, #4 Exhibit D - Jury Demand)(Neff, Erica) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant