This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 08:36:02 (UTC).

Candela v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Candela filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. Whelan and Andrew G. Schopler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01599

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. Whelan

Referral Judge

Andrew G. Schopler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dominic Candela

Defendants

Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc.

Does 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Andrew Kaufman

Attorney at Law Office of David A. Kaufman

3162 Via Alicante, Unit E

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

Vivian Ilana Orlando

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culberson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3476

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Declaration of Hutson Smelley In Support of the Parties' Notice of Settleme

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Motion to Vacate Pending Litigation Deadlines by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hutson Smelley In Support of the Parties' Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Vacate Pending Litigation Deadlines)(Orlando, Vivian) (jdt). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #5 ). The Court orders Defendant to respond to the complaint on or before 9/25/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/21/2020. (jdt) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

5 #1

Declaration of Hutson Smelley in support of the Parties' Joint Motion to Ex

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, --- Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint -- (current deadline is 08/26/20, 30 day extension request to respond by 09/25/20) by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hutson Smelley in support of the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint)(Orlando, Vivian) (jdt). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit A to Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service)(Orlando, Vivian) (jdt). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Orlando, Vivian) (jdt). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation for Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Orlando, Vivian). Modified on 8/19/2020 to add Corporate Parents Transamerica Corporation and AEGON N.V. to Transamerica Life Insurance Company(jdt). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 1 through 5

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, San Diego, case number 37-2020-00015617-CU-IC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14349082.), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc., Does 1-25. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 through 5)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1599-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(zda) (sjt). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ENTRY (AGS): In light of the parties notice of settlement (ECF #7 ), all pending dates are vacated. On November 10, 2020, at 11:00 a.m., the parties must jointly call Judge Schopler's chambers to provide an oral status report as to filing the joint motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating that joint call to chambers. Should the joint motion to dismiss be filed before that time, the obligation to call will be stricken without further Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/23/2020.(no document attached) (mxa) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Motion to Vacate Pending Litigation Deadlines by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hutson Smelley In Support of the Parties' Notice of Settlement and Joint Motion to Vacate Pending Litigation Deadlines)(Orlando, Vivian) (jdt). (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #5 ). The Court orders Defendant to respond to the complaint on or before 9/25/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/21/2020. (jdt) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, --- Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint -- (current deadline is 08/26/20, 30 day extension request to respond by 09/25/20) by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hutson Smelley in support of the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint)(Orlando, Vivian) (jdt). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service)(Orlando, Vivian) (jdt). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Orlando, Vivian) (jdt). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation for Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc. (Orlando, Vivian). Modified on 8/19/2020 to add Corporate Parents Transamerica Corporation and AEGON N.V. to Transamerica Life Insurance Company(jdt). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, San Diego, case number 37-2020-00015617-CU-IC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14349082.), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Inc., Does 1-25. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 through 5)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1599-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(zda) (sjt). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less