This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 08:33:31 (UTC).

Cancino v. Mastro's FTL, LLC,

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Cancino filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Mastro's FTL, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodolfo A Ruiz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-62822

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Carlos Cancino

Defendant

Mastro's FTL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simeon Genadiev

Attorney at The G Law Group, P.A.

350 Lincoln Road, Suite 5038, Miami Beach

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Defendant Attorney

David Sydney Harvey, Jr

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois

401 East Jackson Street, Suite 3400

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Defendant's REPLY to #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Mastro's FTL, LLC. (Harvey, David) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Juan Carlos Cancino in Support of Response in Opposition

#5

(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Case and Discovery and Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support filed by Juan Carlos Cancino. Replies due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Juan Carlos Cancino in Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration)(Genadiev, Simeon) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Case and Discovery and Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support by Mastro's FTL, LLC. Attorney David Sydney Harvey, Jr added to party Mastro's FTL, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Harvey, David) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Mastro's FTL, LLC. (ail) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s) Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mastro's FTL, LLC, d/b/a Mastro's Ocean Club. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12141127, filed by Juan Carlos Cancino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(Genadiev, Simeon) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's REPLY to #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Mastro's FTL, LLC. (Harvey, David) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Case and Discovery and Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support filed by Juan Carlos Cancino. Replies due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Juan Carlos Cancino in Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration)(Genadiev, Simeon) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Case and Discovery and Compel Arbitration and Memorandum in Support by Mastro's FTL, LLC. Attorney David Sydney Harvey, Jr added to party Mastro's FTL, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Harvey, David) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Mastro's FTL, LLC. (ail) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mastro's FTL, LLC, d/b/a Mastro's Ocean Club. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12141127, filed by Juan Carlos Cancino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(Genadiev, Simeon) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.