This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/19/2021 at 10:43:48 (UTC).

Canadian Standards Association v. P.S. Knight Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Canadian Standards Association filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against P S Knight Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01160

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Canadian Standards Association

Defendants

Gordon Knight

PS Knight Americas, Inc.

6055 Red Day Road

Martinsville, IN 46151

P.S. Knight Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicole L. Williams

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael A. Parks

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

55 East Monroe Street, 37Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60603

Katherine E. Colvin

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

55 East Monroe Street, 37Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60603

Elizabeth G. Myers

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

15 #43

*Restricted*

15 #42

*Restricted*

15 #41

*Restricted*

15 #40

*Restricted*

15 #39

*Restricted*

15 #38

*Restricted*

15 #28

*Restricted*

15 #25

*Restricted*

15 #23

*Restricted*

15 #22

*Restricted*

15 #21

*Restricted*

15 #14

Exhibit 14

15 #11

Exhibit 11

15 #10

Exhibit 10

15 #9

Exhibit 9

15 #5

Exhibit 5

15 #4

Exhibit 4

15 #1

Exhibit 1

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER DISMISSING without prejudice Defendant pro se P.S. Knight Americas, Inc.'s #15 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant P.S. Knight Americas, Inc. is HEREBY WARNED that it may not proceed in this action without an attorney. ORDER that P.S. Knight Americas, Inc. shall file a designation of counsel with the court on or before Friday, February 5, 2021. Defendant P.S. Knight Americas, Inc. is admonished that failure to designate counsel by the court's deadline may result in rendition of default judgment and an award of damages or relief in favor of Plaintiff Canadian Standards Association. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss by PS Knight Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Errata 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(jv2) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2020: #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31) (jv2). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2020: #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43) (jv2). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Standards Association. PS Knight Americas, Inc. served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (Williams, Nicole) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Katherine E. Colvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Canadian Standards. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Michael A. Parks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Canadian Standards Association. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Elizabeth G. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to P.S. Knight Co., Ltd., PS Knight Americas, Inc., and Gordon Knight. (lt) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Canadian Standards Association. (Williams, Nicole) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole L. Williams of Katherine E. Colvin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14212076) by on behalf of Canadian Standards Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Nicole) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole L. Williams of Michael A. Parks ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14212028) by on behalf of Canadian Standards Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Nicole) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole L. Williams of Elizabeth Myers ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14211953) by on behalf of Canadian Standards Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Nicole) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Elizabeth G. Myers, Michael A. Parks and Katherine E. Colvin. (dl) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Canadian Standards Association. (dl) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Canadian Standards Association. (Williams, Nicole) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14209057). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Canadian Standards Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Nicole) (Attachment 15 replaced and flattened on 11/23/2020) (cj). (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Canadian Standards Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Knight is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Elizabeth Colvin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth G Myers