This case was last updated from PACER on 05/08/2021 at 11:11:05 (UTC).

Canadian Breaks LLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Canadian Breaks LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barbara M. G. Lynn and Lee Ann Reno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M. G. Lynn

Referral Judge

Lee Ann Reno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

CANADIAN BREAKS LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Craig F Simon

Attorney at Loewinsohn Flegle Deary Simon LLP

12377 Merit Drive, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75251

Kelly D Utsinger

Attorney at Underwood Law Firm PC

Po Box 9158

Amarillo, TX 79105-9158

Stephanie Jean James

Attorney at Underwood Law Firm PC

Po Box 9158

Amarillo, TX 79105

Richard K Welsh

Attorney at Alpha Trial Group LLP

10940 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Craig Stanfield

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1100 Louisiana Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas C Riney

Attorney at Riney & Mayfield LLP

320 S Polk St, Suite 600

Amarillo, TX 79101

W Heath Hendricks

Attorney at Riney & Mayfield LLP

600 Maxor Building, 320 South Polk St

Amarillo, TX 79101

Alvin Lee

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-2601

Matthew Bush

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-2601

Richard T Marooney

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10036-2601

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Stanfield, Craig) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#38

(#38) ORDER granting #37 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard K. Welsh. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/4/2021) (awc) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#37

(#37) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Richard K. Walsh (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Canadian Breaks LLC (James, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#36

(#36) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND TO VACATE THE APRIL 12, 2021 DEADLINE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TREAT THE ORIGINAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS FACIALLY SUFFICIENT re: #16 Motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/4/2021) (awc) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#34

(#34) Supplemental Document by Canadian Breaks LLC as to #30 Order, #33 Supplemental Document Letter to Magistrate Reno transmitting doc for Rule 16 conference with attachment. (Utsinger, Kelly) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (daa). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#33

(#33) Supplemental Document by Canadian Breaks LLC as to #30 Order, Letter to Court Transmitting Document for Rule 16 Conference. (Utsinger, Kelly) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (daa). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#30

(#30) ORDER RESETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: VIDEO FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 4/30/2021 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 4/28/2021) (daa) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#36) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND TO VACATE THE APRIL 12, 2021 DEADLINE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TREAT THE ORIGINAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS FACIALLY SUFFICIENT re: #16 Motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/4/2021) (awc) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

5 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

5 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas C Riney on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Riney, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Stanfield, Craig) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened image on 3/10/2021) (nhp). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11676980) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Stanfield, Craig) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Stanfield, Craig) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #37 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard K. Welsh. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/4/2021) (awc) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Richard K. Walsh (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Canadian Breaks LLC (James, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND TO VACATE THE APRIL 12, 2021 DEADLINE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TREAT THE ORIGINAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS FACIALLY SUFFICIENT re: #16 Motion. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/4/2021) (awc) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#35) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held via VTC on 4/30/2021. The parties are to file either an amended joint proposed scheduling order or other advisory on or before May 7, 2021. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Craig F Simon, Stephanie Jean James, Kelly D Utsinger, Richard K Welsh; Defense - Alvin Lee, Thomas C Riney. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 2:06. (chmb) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Supplemental Document by Canadian Breaks LLC as to #30 Order, #33 Supplemental Document Letter to Magistrate Reno transmitting doc for Rule 16 conference with attachment. (Utsinger, Kelly) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (daa). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Supplemental Document by Canadian Breaks LLC as to #30 Order, Letter to Court Transmitting Document for Rule 16 Conference. (Utsinger, Kelly) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (daa). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly D Utsinger for Stephanie J. James on behalf of Canadian Breaks LLC. (Utsinger, Kelly) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re: #20 MOTION to Remand (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER RESETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: VIDEO FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 4/30/2021 01:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 205 S. E. 5th Ave., Amarillo, TX 79101-1559 before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 4/28/2021) (daa) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING VIDEO RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE -- Joint Proposed Scheduling Order Due Date: April 23, 2021; Video Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: April 28, 2021 @ 11:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/22/2021) (awc) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO PROPERLY ALLEGE CITIZENSHIP: No later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action may be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 3/22/2021) (awc) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE AND NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case is now referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno for pretrial management. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/15/2021) (awc) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Richard T. Marooney (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11691870) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Stanfield, Craig) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11691808) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Alvin Lee added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11691718) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Matthew Bush added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Bush, Matthew) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas C Riney on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Riney, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Stanfield, Craig) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened image on 3/10/2021) (nhp). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11676980) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Stanfield, Craig) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer W Heath Hendricks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alvin Lee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas C Riney