This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 13:12:24 (UTC).

Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc v. The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John McBryde. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00367

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John McBryde

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc

Newlogic Business Loans, Inc.

Defendants

Destiny Williams

Destiny Bozeman Williams

The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc.

The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc. a Texas Corporation doing business as The Spa at Canyon Oaks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mayer H Cersonsky

Attorney at Cersonsky Rosen & Garcia PC

1770 Saint James Place, Suite 150

Houston, TX 77056

William Wade Casey

Attorney at William Wade Casey Attorney at Law

6440 N Central Expwy, Suite 210

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) FINAL JUDGMENT... The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the claims of plaintiff, Can Capital Asset Servicing, Inc., f/k/a Newlogic Business Loans, Inc., against defendants, The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc., and Destiny Williams, be, and are hereby, dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/17/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER... The court ORDERS that plaintiff's motion to dismiss #10 be, and is hereby, granted, and plaintiff's claims against defendants, The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc., and Destiny Williams, be, and are hereby, dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/17/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER Unfiling #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc due to the following deficiency: Document is signed by a law firm in violation of the undersigned's judge-specific requirements and as explained in the May 3 order. Show Cause Response due by 5/17/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/10/2019) (bdb) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER... The court ORDERS that the above-described items be, and are hereby, unfiled and stricken from the record. The court further ORDERS that plaintiff be, and is hereby, granted an extension of time until 4:00p.m. on May 8, 2019, in which to file in proper form its complaint, certificate of interested parties, and designation of local counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/3/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc., Destiny Williams. (wxc) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#6

(#6) ***UNFILED AND STRICKEN PER #9 ORDER*** Plaintiffs Designation of Local Counsel by Mayer H Cersonsky on behalf of Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc. (wxc) Modified on 5/10/2019 (bdb). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#5

(#5) *** UNFILED PER ORDER #8 *** Certificate of Interested Parties by Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc. (wxc) Modified on 5/6/2019 (wxc). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#4

(#4) *** UNFILED PER ORDER #8 *** Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of document #1 received. (wxc) Modified on 5/6/2019 (wxc). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/2/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

1 #6

Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit(s) 4A

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 4

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9960595) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 4A, #6 Cover Sheet) (Cersonsky, Mayer) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FINAL JUDGMENT... The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the claims of plaintiff, Can Capital Asset Servicing, Inc., f/k/a Newlogic Business Loans, Inc., against defendants, The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc., and Destiny Williams, be, and are hereby, dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/17/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER... The court ORDERS that plaintiff's motion to dismiss #10 be, and is hereby, granted, and plaintiff's claims against defendants, The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc., and Destiny Williams, be, and are hereby, dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/17/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc (wxc) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Unfiling #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc due to the following deficiency: Document is signed by a law firm in violation of the undersigned's judge-specific requirements and as explained in the May 3 order. Show Cause Response due by 5/17/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/10/2019) (bdb) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER... The court ORDERS that the above-described items be, and are hereby, unfiled and stricken from the record. The court further ORDERS that plaintiff be, and is hereby, granted an extension of time until 4:00p.m. on May 8, 2019, in which to file in proper form its complaint, certificate of interested parties, and designation of local counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/3/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to The Spa at Canyon Oaks, Inc., Destiny Williams. (wxc) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***UNFILED AND STRICKEN PER #9 ORDER*** Plaintiffs Designation of Local Counsel by Mayer H Cersonsky on behalf of Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc. (wxc) Modified on 5/10/2019 (bdb). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) *** UNFILED PER ORDER #8 *** Certificate of Interested Parties by Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc. (wxc) Modified on 5/6/2019 (wxc). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) *** UNFILED PER ORDER #8 *** Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of document #1 received. (wxc) Modified on 5/6/2019 (wxc). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/2/2019) (wxc) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Can Capital Asset Servicing Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9960595) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 4A, #6 Cover Sheet) (Cersonsky, Mayer) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less