This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/03/2021 at 06:54:00 (UTC).

Campus Book Company, Inc. et al v. McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Campus Book Company, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06339

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Renttext.com, Inc.

CBSKY, Inc.

CBSNM, Inc.

BJJ Corporation

Campus Book Company, Inc.

Defendants

Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C.

McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC

Follett Higher Education Group, Inc.

Barnes & Noble Education, Inc.

Pearson Education Inc.

Cengage Learning Inc.

Educational Publishers Enforcement Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Jasmine S. Wynton

L. Kirstine Rogers

Bruce W. Steckler

R. Dean Gresham

Christine R. Couvillon

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 N. Broom St

Wilmington, DE 19806

Stuart Cochran

Attorney at Steckler Gresham Cochran PLLC

12720 Hillcrest Road, Suite 1045

Dallas, TX 75230

Defendant Attorneys

Adam J. Di Vincenzo

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

David M. Fry

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Zi-Xiang Shen

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

William F. Cavanaugh

Amy N. Vegari

Matt D. Basil

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

300 N. Lasalle Dr., Ste 50Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

David Evan Ross

Attorney at Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP

100 S. West Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael Dockterman

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

227 West Monroe St., Suite 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Andrew J. Ewalt

Eric Mahr

Richard Snyder

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#83

#124

#121

#80

#79

#78

#77

#76

8 #1

Williams Pro Hac Certification

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (83 in 1:20-cv-06339-DLC, 126 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) Memorandum & Opinion, in favor of Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc., Educational Publishers Enforcement Group, Follett Higher Education Group, Follett Higher Education Group, Inc., McGraw Hill, LLC, McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Pearson Education Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Eric Pica against BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc., Alexandra Uchenik, Bruce Puleo, Donovan Mcgee, Elizabeth Kinskey, Grace Kinskey, Jerry Gordon, Julio Lopez, Kaitlyn Belen, Kira Cloonan, Martha Barabas, Mohammad Khalid. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated June 14, 2021, the Defendants' January 22, 2021 motions to dismiss are granted; judgment is entered for the Defendants and the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/15/2021) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC (dt) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) OPINION AND ORDER re: (87 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group. filed by McGraw Hill, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, (78 in 1:20-cv-06339-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group. filed by Pearson Education Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, (93 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss / NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE RETAILER PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. filed by Follett Higher Education Group, McGraw Hill, LLC, Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Cengage Learning, Inc., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., (90 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss Student Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Follett Higher Education Group, McGraw Hill, LLC, Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Cengage Learning, Inc., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc.. The Defendants' January 22, 2021 motions to dismiss are granted. The Clerk of Court shall close the case and enter judgment for the Defendants. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/14/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC (nb) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (93 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss / NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE RETAILER PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Follett Higher Education Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al..(Martin, Craig) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (87 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group., (78 in 1:20-cv-06339-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group. . Document filed by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw Hill, LLC, McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Pearson Education, Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., Pearson Education Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC.(Shapiro, Saul) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) DECLARATION of Suzanne L. Telsey in Support re: (87 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group., (78 in 1:20-cv-06339-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group.. Document filed by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw Hill, LLC, McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Pearson Education, Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., Pearson Education Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC.(Shapiro, Saul) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (87 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group., (78 in 1:20-cv-06339-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group. . Document filed by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw Hill, LLC, McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Pearson Education, Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., Pearson Education Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC.(Shapiro, Saul) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group. Document filed by Cengage Learning Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Pearson Education Inc...(Shapiro, Saul) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (74 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 76 in 1:20-cv-06339-DLC) Letter, filed by Renttext.com, Inc., CBSKY, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., BJJ Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2020.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC (mro) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Bruce W. Steckler and Nicole Williams dated 12/10/2020 re: Independent Collegiate Retailer Plaintiffs' intent to further amend their complaint in response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC.(Steckler, Bruce) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE of Of Firm Name Change. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC.(Steckler, Bruce) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce W. Steckler, R. Dean Gresham, Stuart Cochran and L. Kirstine Rogers - filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Steckler Pro Hac Certification, #2 Gresham Pro Hac Certification, #3 Cochran Pro Hac Certification, #4 Rogers Pro Hac Certification)(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nicole Williams and Mackenzie S. Wallace - filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Williams Pro Hac Certification, #2 Mackenzie Pro Hac Certification)(Bilson, David) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Renttext.com, Inc. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CBSNM, Inc. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by CBSKY, Inc. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by BJJ Corporation. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Campus Book Company, Inc. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Class Action COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Barnes & Noble College Booksellers, LLC, Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc., Educational Publishers Enforcement Group, Follett Higher Education Group, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2832528.) - filed by CBSKY, Inc., BJJ Corporation, Campus Book Company, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/12/2020.] (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renttext.com, Inc. is a litigant