This case was last updated from PACER on 11/25/2019 at 09:19:07 (UTC).

CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC v. GAP INC

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GAP INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and JON D. LEVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00439

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

JON D. LEVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC

Defendant

GAP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEORGE T. DILWORTH

Attorney at DRUMMOND WOODSUM & MACMAHON

84 Marginal Way, Suite 600

Portland, ME 04101

EMILY T. HOWE

Attorney at DRUMMOND WOODSUM & MACMAHON

84 Marginal Way, Suite 600

Portland, ME 04101

Defendant Attorney

NOLAN L. REICHL

Attorney at PIERCE ATWOOD LLP

254 Commercial Street

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC. Reply due by 11/21/2019. (HOWE, EMILY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GAP INC. (REICHL, NOLAN) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC Responses due by 11/12/2019. (DILWORTH, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

9 #3

Exhibit A to Complaint - Lease

9 #7

Motion for Enlargement to Answer

10 #1

Declaration of Joyce Morallos

#9

(#9) STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by GAP INC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Record, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint - Lease, #4 Exhibit B to Complaint - 3rd Amendment to Lease, #5 Exhibit C - 8/28/16 Letter, #6 Summons, #7 Motion for Enlargement to Answer, #8 Order re Motion for Enlargement)(REICHL, NOLAN) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

9 #6

Summons

10 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of Joyce Morallos

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by GAP INC Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce Morallos, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joyce Morallos)(REICHL, NOLAN) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

9 #5

Exhibit C - 8/28/16 Letter

9 #8

Order re Motion for Enlargement

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - REVISED by GAP INC. (REICHL, NOLAN) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

9 #2

Complaint

9 #1

State Court Docket Record

1 #7

annual report

9 #4

Exhibit B to Complaint - 3rd Amendment to Lease

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC. (HOWE, EMILY) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GAP INC. (REICHL, NOLAN) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC. Reply due by 11/21/2019. (HOWE, EMILY) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC. (HOWE, EMILY) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Responses due by 11/7/2019. (akr) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting without objection #11 Motion to Extend Time. The plaintiff shall file its opposition to the defendant's motion to dismiss, ECF No. 10, by November 7, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/30/2019 as to CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC. (akr) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by CAMPLIN/MARINO PROPERTIES INC Responses due by 11/12/2019. (DILWORTH, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by GAP INC Responses due by 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce Morallos, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joyce Morallos)(REICHL, NOLAN) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Filing Fee Received from GAP INC: Receipt Number: 0100-2086788 Method of Payment: CC Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee Date Paid: 10/01/2019 (akr) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by GAP INC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Record, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint - Lease, #4 Exhibit B to Complaint - 3rd Amendment to Lease, #5 Exhibit C - 8/28/16 Letter, #6 Summons, #7 Motion for Enlargement to Answer, #8 Order re Motion for Enlargement)(REICHL, NOLAN) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - REVISED by GAP INC. (REICHL, NOLAN) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by GAP INC re #1 Notice of Removal. Main Document: order on motion. (bfa) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/4/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Set Answer Deadline for GAP INC : Answer due by 10/3/2019. (bfa) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GAP INC. (bfa) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration of Lisa Mertens filed by GAP INC. (bfa) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Declaration of Nolan L. Reichl filed by GAP INC. (bfa) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-19-342. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by GAP INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/26/2019) Fee due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 lease, #3 third amendment to lease, #4 8/28/16 letter, #5 summons, #6 motion for extension to answer, #7 annual report)(bfa) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less