This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:07:52 (UTC).

CAMPBELL v. NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 CAMPBELL filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against NATIONAL SALVAGE SERVICE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01896

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CURTIS CAMPBELL

Defendant

NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION

417 S. Walnut Street

Bloomington, IN 47401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Mark Adams

Attorney at JOHN H. HASKIN & ASSOCIATES, LLC

255 North Alabama, Second Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

John H. Haskin

Attorney at JOHN H. HASKIN & ASSOCIATES, LLC

255 North Alabama, Second Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Matthew Heeb

Attorney at BUNGER & ROBERTSON

226 South College Square, P O Box 910

Bloomington, IN 47404-0910

James L. Whitlatch

Attorney at BUNGER & ROBERTSON

P O Box 910, 226 S College Sq

Bloomington, IN 47402

Kathryn Elizabeth DeWeese

Attorney at BUNGER & ROBERTSON

226 South College Avenue, P.O. Box 910

Bloomington, IN 47402

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 04:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/11/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff CURTIS CAMPBELL . (Adams, Samuel) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#13

(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION.(DeWeese, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Elizabeth DeWeese on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (DeWeese, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (Whitlatch, James) Modified on 8/6/2020 - edited docket text to match title of document (NAD). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Zebulun Mountains, Inc. for NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION.. (Whitlatch, James) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Matthew Heeb on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (Heeb, Ryan) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Whitlatch on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (Whitlatch, James) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service, filed by CURTIS CAMPBELL. NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION served on 7/29/2020. (Haskin, John) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#6

(#6) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. (JDH) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (AKH) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Mark Adams on behalf of Plaintiff CURTIS CAMPBELL. (Adams, Samuel) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff CURTIS CAMPBELL. (Haskin, John) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION, filed by CURTIS CAMPBELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6081007) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 04:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/11/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff CURTIS CAMPBELL . (Adams, Samuel) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION.(DeWeese, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Elizabeth DeWeese on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (DeWeese, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (Whitlatch, James) Modified on 8/6/2020 - edited docket text to match title of document (NAD). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Zebulun Mountains, Inc. for NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION.. (Whitlatch, James) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Matthew Heeb on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (Heeb, Ryan) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Whitlatch on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (Whitlatch, James) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service, filed by CURTIS CAMPBELL. NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION served on 7/29/2020. (Haskin, John) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. (JDH) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION. (AKH) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Mark Adams on behalf of Plaintiff CURTIS CAMPBELL. (Adams, Samuel) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff CURTIS CAMPBELL. (Haskin, John) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against NATIONAL SALVAGE & SERVICE CORPORATION, filed by CURTIS CAMPBELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6081007) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less