This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2019 at 08:54:32 (UTC).

Campbell v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Campbell filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00161

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Ann Campbell

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heather K. Karrh

Attorney at Rogers, Hofrichter & Karrh, LLC

225 S. Glynn Street, Suite A

Fayetteville, GA 30214

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Settlement by Mary Ann Campbell (Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons form

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mary Ann Campbell. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons form)(Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Mary Ann Campbell (Karrh, Heather) Modified on 9/17/2019 (maa). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

2 #1

Forms

#2

(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Mary Ann Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Settlement by Mary Ann Campbell (Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mary Ann Campbell. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons form)(Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Mary Ann Campbell (Karrh, Heather) Modified on 9/17/2019 (maa). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2681889. (pts) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Mary Ann Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less