This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2020 at 09:50:39 (UTC).

CAMPBELL v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 CAMPBELL filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03100

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert B. Campbell

Defendant

Internal Revenue Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER ROY KALYNIUK

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 227

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Order Initial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/2/2020. (ce3) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) (KALYNIUK, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

Brief

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KALYNIUK, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, - Supplemental Certificate of Service (KALYNIUK, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit - Redacted Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Internal Revenue Service from Superior Court of New Jersey, Monmouth Vicinage, case number SC-380-20., filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KALYNIUK, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Initial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/2/2020. (ce3) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) (KALYNIUK, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6). Motion set for 4/20/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KALYNIUK, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, - Supplemental Certificate of Service (KALYNIUK, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information Should be entered in ALL CAPS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (eaj) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Internal Revenue Service from Superior Court of New Jersey, Monmouth Vicinage, case number SC-380-20., filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KALYNIUK, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less