This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:10:12 (UTC).

Campbell v. Citibank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Campbell filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Citibank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00111

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valarie Shirese Campbell

Defendants

Citibank, N.A.

Bank of America, N.A.

Discover Bank

Equifax Information Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erik-Anthony W Fox

Attorney at Cogburn Law Offices

2580 St. Rose Parkway, Suite 330

Henderson, NV 89074

Jamie S Cogburn

Attorney at Cogburn Law Offices

2580 St. Rose Parkway, Suite 330

Henderson, NV 89074

Defendant Attorneys

Joel Edward Tasca

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Darren T Brenner

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Ramir Mitchell Hernandez

Attorney at WRIGHT FINLAY & ZAK, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave, Ste 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

David Ernesto Chavez

Attorney at Ballard Spahr

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6768618) by Valarie Shirese Campbell. Proof of service due by 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fox, Erik-Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Valarie Shirese Campbell. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valarie Shirese Campbell. Citibank, N.A. waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank of America, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. added. (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valarie Shirese Campbell. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valarie Shirese Campbell. Discover Bank waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Discover Bank. (Chavez, David) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discover Bank answer due 4/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 3/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

12 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#13) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (Tasca, Joel) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (Tasca, Joel) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 3/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discover Bank answer due 4/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Discover Bank. (Chavez, David) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valarie Shirese Campbell. Discover Bank waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valarie Shirese Campbell. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank of America, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. added. (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Hernandez, Ramir) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valarie Shirese Campbell. Citibank, N.A. waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Valarie Shirese Campbell. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fox, Erik-Anthony) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6768618) by Valarie Shirese Campbell. Proof of service due by 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fox, Erik-Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant