This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 07:51:37 (UTC).

Campbell v. Arizona Beverages USA LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Campbell filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Arizona Beverages USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02752

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcia Campbell

Defendants

Arizona Beverages USA LLC

Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Ryan Gustafson

Attorney at Good Gustafson Aumais LLP

2330 Westwood Blvd., Suite 103

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Christopher Terrence Aumais

Attorney at Good Gustafson Aumais LLP

2330 Westwood Blvd., Suite 103

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Paul Donovan

Attorney at Stevens & Lee

669 River Drive, Suite 201

Elmwood Park, NJ 07407

Kirby Hsu

Attorney at Willenken LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 3850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#18) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert P. Donovan.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Robert P. Donovan, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17312522.) filed by Arizona Beverages USA LLC, Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice)(Donovan, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advan ced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 3, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 06/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arizona Beverages USA LLC, Hornell Brewing Co., Inc... (Hsu, Kirby) (Filed on 6/23/2022) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Arizona Beverages USA LLC, Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Beverage Marketing USA, Inc. for Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Hsu, Kirby) (Filed on 6/22/2022) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Arizona Beverages USA LLC, Hornell Brewing Co., Inc., Marcia Campbell. (Hsu, Kirby) (Filed on 6/22/2022) Modified on 6/23/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marcia Campbell.. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 6/21/2022) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Arizona Beverage Company LLC on 06/01/2022, filed by Marcia Campbell. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 6/6/2022) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Hornell Brewing Co on 06/01/2022, filed by Marcia Campbell. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 6/6/2022) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Arizona Beverages USA LLC, Hornell Brewing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 5/13/2022) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 5/13/2022) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2022 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Christopher T. Aumais- ECF shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on EC F. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Marcia Campbell (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/24/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NO PROCESS- COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Class Action against Arizona Beverages USA LLC, Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17158530.). Filed by Marcia Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gustafson, John) (Filed on 5/9/2022) Modified on 5/10/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hornell Brewing Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Arizona Beverages USA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT P. DONOVAN