This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2023 at 13:42:23 (UTC).

CAMPBELL v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 CAMPBELL filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against AMAZON COM, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Matthew J. Skahill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06214

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Matthew J. Skahill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIJAH CAMPBELL

Defendants

AMAZON.COM, INC. doing business as AMAZON.COM

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TIMOTHY STEVEN SEILER

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI PC

3331 Street Road, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

ARI R. KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road, Suite 128, Two Greenwood Square

Bensalem, PA 19020

Defendant Attorneys

KEITH J. ROSENBLATT

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

One Newark Center, 8Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

MARLIE P. BLAISE

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1085 Raymond Blvd, 8Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13775389) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELIJAH CAMPBELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY STEVEN SEILER on behalf of ELIJAH CAMPBELL (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 10/23/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELIJAH CAMPBELL. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022; AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022; AMAZON.COM, INC. waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal that Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, Inc., are dismissed from this action without prejudice by ELIJAH CAMPBELL. (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MARLIE P. BLAISE on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#8

(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amazon.com Services LLC.. (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC.(ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#10

(#10) Order Initial Conference set for 2/1/2023 at 2:30 PM via teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 1/10/2023. (mag) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#11

(#11) Joint Discovery Plan by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC.(BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/14/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2023. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 7/8/2023. Dispositive motions shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court no later than 11/21/2023 if there will be expert discovery and by 8/22/2023 if no expert discovery will be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 2/2/2023. (tf, ) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/14/2023 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2023. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 7/8/2023. Dispositive motions shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court no later than 11/21/2023 if there will be expert discovery and by 8/22/2023 if no expert discovery will be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 2/2/2023. (tf, ) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill: Initial Conference held by phone on 2/1/2023. (rss, ) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER: The call in information for the initial conference scheduled for February 1, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 1/26/23. (Shaw, A) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Discovery Plan by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC.(BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order Initial Conference set for 2/1/2023 at 2:30 PM via teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 1/10/2023. (mag) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC.(ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/10/2023. (mag) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amazon.com Services LLC.. (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. ROSENBLATT on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (ROSENBLATT, KEITH) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MARLIE P. BLAISE on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (BLAISE, MARLIE) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal that Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, Inc., are dismissed from this action without prejudice by ELIJAH CAMPBELL. (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELIJAH CAMPBELL. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022; AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022; AMAZON.COM, INC. waiver sent on 10/25/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY STEVEN SEILER on behalf of ELIJAH CAMPBELL (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 10/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketJudge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw) (Entered: 10/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13775389) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELIJAH CAMPBELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less