This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:52:31 (UTC).

Campbell et al v. Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Campbell filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00079

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelly Campbell

Pawtucket, RI 02860

Eric Campbell

Pawtucket, RI 02860

Defendant

Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation. Summons and USm-285 Forms forwarded to the US Marshals Service for service of process. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#6

(#6) Letter sent to Eric Campbell and Kelly Campbell requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/22/2019. (Noel, Jeannine) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation, filed by Eric Campbell, Kelly Campbell.(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Campbell, Kelly Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Eric Campbell, Kelly Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation. Summons and USm-285 Forms forwarded to the US Marshals Service for service of process. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter sent to Eric Campbell and Kelly Campbell requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/22/2019. (Noel, Jeannine) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rhode Island Housing and Mortgage Finance Corporation, filed by Eric Campbell, Kelly Campbell.(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Campbell, Kelly Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Eric Campbell, Kelly Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Notice of Availability to Receive Documents Electronically. Pro Se litigants are encouraged to review the details of the Consent & Registration Form and if interested, complete the Registration Form and return it to the Clerks Office. Click # here to access the form. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Campbell, Kelly Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Eric Campbell, Kelly Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.