Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2019 at 07:20:48 (UTC).

CAMP v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 CAMP filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against ALLEGHENY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa Pupo Lenihan and Patricia L. Dodge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00635

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lisa Pupo Lenihan

Patricia L. Dodge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLAN CAMP

Waynesburg, PA 15370

Defendants

SANDRA PREHUS

ANTHONY KRASTEK

ALLEGHENY COUNTY CRIME LABORATORY

MICHAEL STREILY

ALLEGHENY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

STEVEN ZAPPALA

ROBERT E COLVILLE

PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE (PSP) CRIME LABORATORY (DNA UNIT)

ALLEGHENY COUNTY FORENSIC LABORATORIES

 

Court Documents

10 #7

Envelope

10 #6

Exhibit F

10 #5

Exhibit E

10 #4

Exhibit D

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY FORENSIC LABORATORIES, ALLEGHENY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, ANTHONY KRASTEK, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE (PSP) CRIME LABORATORY (DNA UNIT), SANDRA PREHUS, MICHAEL STREILY, filed by ALLAN CAMP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Envelope) (mao) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#8

(#8) Partial Payment of Filing Fee by ALLAN CAMP. Fee $30.24, receipt number 24668057003. (gmt) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by ALLAN CAMP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ept) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY CRIME LABORATORY, ALLEGHENY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, ROBERT E COLVILLE, ANTHONY KRASTEK, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE (PSP) CRIME LABORATORY (DNA UNIT), SANDRA PREHUS, MICHAEL STREILY, STEVEN ZAPPALA, filed by ALLAN CAMP. (ept) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on June 6, 2019. (kcc) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit Authorization

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire filing fee. Plaintiff shall pay $30.24 as an initial partial filing fee as provided by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A); however, he is still assessed the total $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward, within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order, the initial partial filing fee of $30.24 to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff shall be required to make monthly payments of twenty percent of the preceding month's income (that is, all funds deposited into the account) credited to the account. Plaintiff is warned that he is ultimately responsible for payment of the filing fee if the agency with custody over him lapses in its duty to make payments on his behalf. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to the Inmate Account Officer at Plaintiff's place of confinement. The Clerk of Court shall enclose an authorization form which Plaintiff shall complete and return within ten (10) days of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint and any attached exhibits. If the initial partial filing fee of $30.24 is not received within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order then this action may be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on June 6, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Authorization) (kcc) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

1 #3

Complaint

1 #2

Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY FORENSIC LABORATORIES, ALLEGHENY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, ANTHONY KRASTEK, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE (PSP) CRIME LABORATORY (DNA UNIT), SANDRA PREHUS, MICHAEL STREILY, filed by ALLAN CAMP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Envelope) (mao) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/09/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Partial Payment of Filing Fee by ALLAN CAMP. Fee $30.24, receipt number 24668057003. (gmt) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Remark: A certified copy of Plaintiff's Authorization (ECF No. #6 ) was mailed to the Inmate Account Officer at S.C.I. Greene. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by ALLAN CAMP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ept) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by ALLAN CAMP. (ept) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY CRIME LABORATORY, ALLEGHENY COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, ROBERT E COLVILLE, ANTHONY KRASTEK, PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE (PSP) CRIME LABORATORY (DNA UNIT), SANDRA PREHUS, MICHAEL STREILY, STEVEN ZAPPALA, filed by ALLAN CAMP. (ept) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on June 6, 2019. (kcc) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent that the case may proceed without the prepayment of the entire filing fee. Plaintiff shall pay $30.24 as an initial partial filing fee as provided by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A); however, he is still assessed the total $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward, within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order, the initial partial filing fee of $30.24 to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff shall be required to make monthly payments of twenty percent of the preceding month's income (that is, all funds deposited into the account) credited to the account. Plaintiff is warned that he is ultimately responsible for payment of the filing fee if the agency with custody over him lapses in its duty to make payments on his behalf. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to the Inmate Account Officer at Plaintiff's place of confinement. The Clerk of Court shall enclose an authorization form which Plaintiff shall complete and return within ten (10) days of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint and any attached exhibits. If the initial partial filing fee of $30.24 is not received within THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date of this Order then this action may be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on June 6, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Authorization) (kcc) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALLAN CAMP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of IFP motion, #2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #3 Complaint, #4 Envelope) (ept) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA STATE POLICE is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLEGHENY COUNTY is a litigant