Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/17/2020 at 07:59:11 (UTC).

Cameron International Corporation v. Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2020 Cameron International Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Butch's Rathole Anchor Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00124

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Cameron International Corporation

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant

Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John R. Keville

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

800 Capitol Street, Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002

William M. Logan

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

800 Capitol Street, Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002

Merritt D. Westcott

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

800 Capitol St., Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002-2925

Evan D. Lewis

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

800 Capitol St., Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002-2925

Counter Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Jared M. Hoggan

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C.

1600 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

David Greer Henry

Attorney at Gray Reed

900 Washington Ave., 8Th Floor

Waco, TX 76706

David T. DeZern

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw LLP

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Eric Sean Tautfest

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

David M. Lisch

Attorney at Gray Reed and McGraw LLP

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Mara Jill Bindler

Attorney at Gray Reed and McGraw

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING, Markman Hearing set for 9/4/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#22

RESTRICTED

#21

(#21) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Cameron International Corporation.(Keville, John) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mara Jill Bindler on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared M. Hoggan on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (Hoggan, Jared) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sean Tautfest on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (Tautfest, Eric) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Lisch on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (Lisch, David) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T. DeZern on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (DeZern, David) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#11

(#21) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Cameron International Corporation.(Keville, John) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cameron International Corporation. (Keville, John) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

4 #1

AO120

#4

(#4) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file using the event NOTICE OF FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK FORM upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO120) (bw) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William M. Logan on behalf of Cameron International Corporation. Attorney William M. Logan added to party Cameron International Corporation(pty:pla) (Logan, William) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cameron International Corporation. (Keville, John) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13217580), filed by Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keville, John) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING, Markman Hearing set for 9/4/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Case called for a telephonic Scheduling Conference. Markman Hearing has been set for 9/18/20 at 1:30 p.m. for a half day Markman. Parties will submitting electronic tutorials and are going to work on the protective order. A trial date will be set at the Markman Hearing. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(am) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Cameron International Corporation.(Keville, John) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mara Jill Bindler on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (Bindler, Mara) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared M. Hoggan on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (Hoggan, Jared) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sean Tautfest on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (Tautfest, Eric) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Lisch on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (Lisch, David) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T. DeZern on behalf of Butch's Rathole & Anchor Service, Inc. (DeZern, David) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE. Case is SET for a telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference on Wednesday, April 8, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. via telephone conference set for 4/8/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Keville, John) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evan Lewis ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13223591) by on behalf of Cameron International Corporation. (Lewis, Evan) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Merritt D. Westcott ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13223500) by on behalf of Cameron International Corporation. (Westcott, Merritt) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cameron International Corporation. (Keville, John) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file using the event NOTICE OF FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK FORM upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO120) (bw) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William M. Logan on behalf of Cameron International Corporation. Attorney William M. Logan added to party Cameron International Corporation(pty:pla) (Logan, William) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cameron International Corporation. (Keville, John) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13217580), filed by Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keville, John) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butch's Rat Hole & Anchor Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant