This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2022 at 08:06:01 (UTC).

Camellia Condominium Association Inc. v. United Specialty Insurance Co et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 Camellia Condominium Association Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United Specialty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Carol B Whitehurst. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-04460

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Camellia Condominium Association, Inc.

Camellia Condominium Association Inc

Defendants

Peleus Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

Third Coast Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Co

Peleus Insurance Co

Third Coast Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trent Jared Moss

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys

3540 S I-10 Service Rd W Ste 300

Metairie, LA 70001

Galen M Hair

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys

3540 S I-10 Service Rd W Ste 300

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant Attorney

Joseph P Guichet

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al (NO)

601 Poydras St Ste 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Peleus Insurance Company. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 3/30/2022 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Third Coast Insurance Co.(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

12 #2

Exhibit A

12 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Peleus Insurance Company by Peleus Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Peleus Insurance Co answer due 2/22/2022; Third Coast Insurance Co answer due 2/22/2022; United Specialty Insurance Co answer due 2/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/16/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Joseph P Guichet on behalf of Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/2/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

9 #1

Proposed order

#9

(#9) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co and United Specialty Insurance Co answer due 2/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/2/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

7 #1

Proposed order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Joseph P Guichet added to party Peleus Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph P Guichet added to party Third Coast Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph P Guichet added to party United Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Camellia Condominium Association Inc. Peleus Insurance Co served on 1/11/2022, answer due 2/1/2022. (aty,Moss, Trent) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Camellia Condominium Association Inc. (aty,Moss, Trent) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against Peleus Insurance Company, Third Coast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4944084) filed by Camellia Condominium Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Trent Jared Moss added to party Camellia Condominium Association, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Moss, Trent) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Peleus Insurance Company. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 3/30/2022 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Peleus Insurance Company. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/22/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Third Coast Insurance Co.(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Peleus Insurance Company by Peleus Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Peleus Insurance Co answer due 2/22/2022; Third Coast Insurance Co answer due 2/22/2022; United Specialty Insurance Co answer due 2/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/16/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Joseph P Guichet on behalf of Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/2/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #9 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co and United Specialty Insurance Co answer due 2/15/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/2/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Joseph P Guichet added to party Peleus Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph P Guichet added to party Third Coast Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph P Guichet added to party United Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Guichet, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Camellia Condominium Association Inc. Peleus Insurance Co served on 1/11/2022, answer due 2/1/2022. (aty,Moss, Trent) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Camellia Condominium Association Inc. (aty,Moss, Trent) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peleus Insurance Co, Third Coast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Trent Jared Moss on behalf of Camellia Condominium Association Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/18/2022. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against Peleus Insurance Company, Third Coast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4944084) filed by Camellia Condominium Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Trent Jared Moss added to party Camellia Condominium Association, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Moss, Trent) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peleus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where United Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P Guichet