This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 09:13:38 (UTC).

Cambria Company LLC v. Cosentino S.A. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Cambria Company LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cosentino S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00896

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cambria Company LLC

Defendants

Stone Systems of Houston, LLC

Quartz Surface Supplies, Inc.

Stone Suppliers, Inc.

Stone Systems of New Mexico, LLC

Stone-Made Products, Inc.

Stone Systems of Central Texas LLC

Cosentino S.A.

C & C North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Natalie Terhune Arbaugh

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 N. Pearl St, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Alex Wolens

2121 N. Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Katherine Kelly Vidal

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

M. Brett Johnson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 N. Pearl Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

E. Danielle T. Williams

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

300 S. Tryon Street, 16Th Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

Joseph Becker

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Jason Z. Pesick

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Eimeric Reig-Plessis

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

275 Middlefield Road, Suite 205

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

31 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

#31

(#31) Unopposed MOTION to Enter [Proposed] Order Regarding Service and Answer by Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

30 #1

Proposed Order

#30

(#30) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh for Joseph Becker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14046228) by on behalf of Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

29 #1

Proposed Order

#29

(#29) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh for E. Danielle T. Williams ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14043243) by on behalf of Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#28

(#28) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Brett Johnson for Alex Wolens ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14042093) by on behalf of Cambria Company LLC. (Johnson, M.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

25 #1

Proposed Order

#24

Text Order GRANTING #24 , #25 , #26 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motions, finds they should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the applicants, if they have not already done so, shall each immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorneys hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 10/04/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Stone Systems of New Mexico, LLC (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Stone Systems of Houston, LLC (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Stone Systems of Central Texas, LLC (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to C & C North America, Inc. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Cosentino S.A. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14018755), filed by Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Unopposed MOTION to Enter [Proposed] Order Regarding Service and Answer by Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Vidal, Katherine) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph Becker for Cambria Company LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh for Joseph Becker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14046228) by on behalf of Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney E. Danielle T. Williams for Cambria Company LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alex Wolens for Cambria Company LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh for E. Danielle T. Williams ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14043243) by on behalf of Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Brett Johnson for Alex Wolens ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14042093) by on behalf of Cambria Company LLC. (Johnson, M.) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #24 , #25 , #26 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motions, finds they should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the applicants, if they have not already done so, shall each immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorneys hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 10/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh for Jason Z. Pesick ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14028249) by on behalf of Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Natalie Terhune Arbaugh for Eimeric Reig-Plessis ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14028161) by on behalf of Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Quartz Surface Supplies, Inc. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Stone Suppliers, Inc. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Stone-Made Products, Inc. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Stone Systems of New Mexico, LLC (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Stone Systems of Houston, LLC (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Stone Systems of Central Texas, LLC (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to C & C North America, Inc. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cambria Company LLC. to Cosentino S.A. (Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14018755), filed by Cambria Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Arbaugh, Natalie) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C & C North America Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAMBRIA COMPANY LLC is a litigant