This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2019 at 07:41:19 (UTC).

Camacho et al v. BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 Camacho filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against BRC Rubber Plastics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00391

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gricelda Sanchez

Esther Madrigal

Cristy Camacho

Guadalupe Estrada

Lorena Madrigal

Reyna Regalado

Susana Guajardo

Carmen Regalado

Olga Puebla

Victoria Villagomez

Defendant

BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.

1029 West State Boulevard, Suite A

Fort Wayne, IN 46808

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher C Myers

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Cathy T Serrano

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorney

Thomas M Kimbrough

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry St, Po Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46801

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Serrano, Cathy) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Continue and Reset Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference by Defendant BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.. (Kimbrough, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#7

(#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person. (mr) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William C Lee recused. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 9/18/2019. (lns) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc..(Kimbrough, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Kimbrough on behalf of BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc. (Kimbrough, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B - Complaints

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4002325.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1909-CT-000485, filed by BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaints)(Kimbrough, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared by atty Cathy Serrano. Dft appeared by atty Thomas Kimbrough. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. Discovery deadline is 11/13/2020. Dispositive motion deadline is 12/4/2020. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/12/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Serrano, Cathy) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #8 Dft's Motion to Continue and Reset Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference is granted. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 10/22/2019 at 9:30 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Continue and Reset Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference by Defendant BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.. (Kimbrough, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person. (mr) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge William C Lee recused. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 9/18/2019. (lns) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mlc) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc..(Kimbrough, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Kimbrough on behalf of BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc. (Kimbrough, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4002325.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1909-CT-000485, filed by BRC Rubber & Plastics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaints)(Kimbrough, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less