This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:44:25 (UTC).

Calvin-Wheeler v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Calvin-Wheeler filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony E. Porcelli and Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02989

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenya Calvin-Wheeler

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Alan Steinberg

Attorney at Michael A. Steinberg & Associates

Suite 195, 4925 Independence Pkwy

Tampa, FL 33634

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/6/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/5/2019. (JMF) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF of service by Kenya Calvin-Wheeler as to Attorney General of the United States. (TDC) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF of service by Kenya Calvin-Wheeler as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (TDC) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Kenya Calvin-Wheeler. Commissioner of Social Security (US Attorney) served on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020. (TDC) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BES) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kenya Calvin-Wheeler. Related case(s): no (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/6/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/5/2019. (JMF) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-2989-T-33AEP. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (SJB) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Kenya Calvin-Wheeler. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Kenya Calvin-Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.