This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2022 at 07:26:46 (UTC).

Calvin v. Boe et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Calvin filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Boe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ricardo S. Martinez and Brian A Tsuchida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-05217

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

Referral Judge

Brian A Tsuchida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Calvin

Monroe, WA 98272-0888

Defendants

Jeri Boe

Evans

John Doe 1

John Doe 2

John Doe 3

John Doe 4

John Doe 5

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint

1 #2

Letter from Filer

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application,. ***Action Required*** Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 5/5/2022 to correct IFP application **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Donald Calvin, Prisoner ID: 251585)(ST) Modified on 4/11/2022 to update page count - NEF regenerated (KB). (Entered: 04/05/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint

4 #2

Prison Trust Account Statement

4 #3

Cover Letter

#5

(#5) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Institution to Calculate, Collect, and Forward Payments. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Donald Calvin, Prisoner ID: 251585)(SB) (cc: finance, Washington Dept of Corrections) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

1983 Civil Rights Complaint with Instructions

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Declining Service and Granting Leave to Amend. The Court will not authorize service of the amended complaint on any Defendant who is not sufficiently identified or specifically linked to a violation of Plaintiff's rights. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to adequately address the issues raised herein on or before 6/13/2022, the Court will recommend dismissal of this case. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (Attachments: #1 1983 Civil Rights Complaint with Instructions)**20 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Donald Calvin, Prisoner ID: 251585) (SB) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Institution to Calculate, Collect, and Forward Payments. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Donald Calvin, Prisoner ID: 251585)(SB) (cc: finance, Washington Dept of Corrections) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Tsuchida, filed by Donald Calvin. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement, #3 Cover Letter)**17 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Donald Calvin, Prisoner ID: 251585)(ST) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketIFP deficiency corrected **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Donald Calvin, Prisoner ID: 251585)(ST) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Monroe Correctional Complex. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Donald Calvin, Prisoner ID: 251585)(ST) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application,. ***Action Required*** Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 5/5/2022 to correct IFP application **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Donald Calvin, Prisoner ID: 251585)(ST) Modified on 4/11/2022 to update page count - NEF regenerated (KB). (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Donald Calvin. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Letter from Filer)**16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Donald Calvin, Prisoner ID: 251585)(ST) Modified on 4/5/2022. Corrected number of pages received. Entry regenerated to plaintiff for his records. (ST) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVANS is a litigant