This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:31:52 (UTC).

Calviello v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Calviello filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-21044

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geraldine S. Calviello

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN A. GOLDSTEIN

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

2500 Main Place Tower, 350 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Notice of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#9

(#9) Short Form Complaint by Geraldine S. Calviello. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#10

(#10) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Geraldine S. Calviello. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC waiver sent on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06291. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-184: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Geraldine S. Calviello (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#6

(#6) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-184: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12021109 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Geraldine S. Calviello. (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Geraldine S. Calviello. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC waiver sent on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Short Form Complaint by Geraldine S. Calviello. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06291. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-184: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-184: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/7/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/7/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Geraldine S. Calviello (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12021109 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Geraldine S. Calviello. (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.