This case was last updated from PACER on 05/21/2021 at 09:51:36 (UTC).

Calvacca v. Kids II Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Calvacca filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Kids II Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary R. Brown and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01503

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary R. Brown

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kiara Calvacca

Defendant

Kids II Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mordecai T. Schwartz

Attorney at Schwartz Goldstone Campisi & Kates, LLP

90 Broad Street, Suite 403

New York, NY 10004

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher R. Carton

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

317 George Street, Suite 320

New Brunswick, NJ 08901

Alana K Bassin

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

150 South Fifth Street, Ste 3000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jennifer L Bullard

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

150 South Fifth Street, Suite 3000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Interrogatories by Kiara Calvacca. (Schwartz, Mordecai) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#13

(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Bullard, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#12

(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Kids II Inc. (Bullard, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

11 #1

Affidavit

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number BNYEDC-14402095. by Kids II Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#10

(#10) INTERROGATORIES Propounded by Kiara Calvacca. (Schwartz, Mordecai) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Mordecai T. Schwartz on behalf of Kiara Calvacca (notification declined or already on case) (Schwartz, Mordecai) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#6

(#6) STATE COURT RECORD Received from the Suffolk County Clerk's Office enclosing Certified Copy of Clerk's Minutes for the E-filed Supreme Court case, Index #603103/2021, along with a copy of the Notice of Removal or 8019(c) with order. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

4 #1

Additional Quality Control Check Sheet

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 3/23/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2021: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kids II Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kids2 Holding LLC for Kids II Inc.. (Carton, Christopher) Modified on 3/23/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Kids II Inc.. (Carton, Christopher) Modified on 3/23/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Certification of Christopher Carton

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kids II Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 603106/2021. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14299662) (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher Carton, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carton, Christopher) Modified on 3/23/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Interrogatories by Kiara Calvacca. (Schwartz, Mordecai) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Bullard, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Kids II Inc. (Bullard, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketORDER: The May 12, 2021 conference is converted to a telephone conference to be held at 11:20 a.m. The Court will initiate the conference call. The parties are directed to dial (888) 278-0296 at the scheduled time to access the call center. At the prompt enter access code 9424335. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/7/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketORDER: The time of the May 12, 2021 conference is advanced to 11:20 p.m.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/30/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #11 : The Motion of Alana K. Bassin for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/23/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number BNYEDC-14402095. by Kids II Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Bassin, Alana) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #10 Interrogatories Propounded filed by Kiara Calvacca. The parties are advised that discovery documents should not be filed on ECF unless annexed as an exhibit to a motion to compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/22/2021. (Jacobwitz, Beth) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INTERROGATORIES Propounded by Kiara Calvacca. (Schwartz, Mordecai) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Mordecai T. Schwartz on behalf of Kiara Calvacca (notification declined or already on case) (Schwartz, Mordecai) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #7 : The Motion of Jennifer Bullard for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/13/2021. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Bullard Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14364178. by Kids II Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer Bullard) (Bullard, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT RECORD Received from the Suffolk County Clerk's Office enclosing Certified Copy of Clerk's Minutes for the E-filed Supreme Court case, Index #603103/2021, along with a copy of the Notice of Removal or 8019(c) with order. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 3/23/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2021: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kids II Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kids2 Holding LLC for Kids II Inc.. (Carton, Christopher) Modified on 3/23/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Kids II Inc.. (Carton, Christopher) Modified on 3/23/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kids II Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, Case Number 603106/2021. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14299662) (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher Carton, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carton, Christopher) Modified on 3/23/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kids Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Leigh Bullard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alana K Bassin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher R. Carton