This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/30/2021 at 07:12:40 (UTC).

People of the State of California v. EVIG, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against EVIG, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02330

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

EVIG, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick Dennis Collins

Attorney at Napa County District Attorney's Office

1127 First Street, Suite C

Napa, CA 94559

Defendant Attorney

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service

#20

19 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

16 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service

16 #1

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT EVIG, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS

#16

#14

#6

#5

4 #3

Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service

4 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

4 #1

Supplement DEFENDANT EVIG, LLCS STATEMENT OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS

#4

#3

1 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byEVIG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 5/21/2021) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byPeople of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Collins, Patrick) (Filed on 5/14/2021) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Remand ) filed byPeople of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Collins, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Collins, Patrick) (Filed on 5/13/2021) Modified on 5/14/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Remand ) filed byEVIG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF KURT HARRIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT EVIG, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIAS MOTION TO REMAND AND FOR FEES UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1447(C), #2 DECLARATION OF LEX HOWARD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT EVIG, LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIAS MOTION TO REMAND AND FOR FEES UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1447(C), #3 Certificate/Proof of Service )(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 5/7/2021) Modified on 5/10/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, hearings for the Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor are not to be set telephonically in ECF. [err102] Corrected by Clerk& #039;s Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EVIG, LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2021) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss filed by EVIG, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/14/2021. Replies due by 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT EVIG, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIAS COMPLAINT, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/3/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for July 6, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by June 29, 2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-02330-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Remand filed by People of the State of California. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/4/2021. Replies due by 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Patrick Collins and Exhibits A-C, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Collins, Patrick) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 4/20/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by EVIG, LLC (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Civil Cover Sheet by EVIG, LLC . (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by EVIG, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nevada Business Consortium for EVIG, LLC. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 filed by EVIG, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nevada Business Consortium for EVIG, LLC. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error Re: #4 Notice of Removal filed by EVIG, LLC. Incorrect event used. [err101] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT from Superior Court of California, County of Napa. Their case number is 21CV000242, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15794058). Filed by EVIG, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement DEFENDANT EVIG, LLCS STATEMENT OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by EVIG, LLC (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/14/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT from Superior Court of California, County of Napa. Their case number is 21CV000242, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15778013). Filed by EVIG, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 3/31/2021) Modified on 4/1/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less