This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:13:13 (UTC).

California Shellfish Co., Inc. v. Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Ins. Co. et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 California Shellfish Co , Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Ins Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Allison Claire. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00924

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Shellfish Co., Inc.

Defendants

The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company

The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection and Insurance Company of Connecticut

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M. Zachary Smith

Attorney at Weintraub Tobin

400 Capitol Mall, Ste 11Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer June Kellar

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

101 W. Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Michelle R. Bernard

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

101 W. Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibits 1-7

1 #2

Proof of Service

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Proof of Service

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Proof of Service

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Proof of Service

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Standing Order

5 #2

Consent Form

5 #3

VDRP

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by California Shellfish Co., Inc.. (Smith, M. Zachary) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER by The Hartford Steam Boiler Inspection et al. Attorney Kellar, Jennifer June added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kellar, Jennifer) Modified on 6/6/2022 (Rodriguez, E). (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re #5 Civil New Case Documents by All Defendants. (Bernard, Michelle) Modified on 6/2/2022 (Huang, H). (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of RELATED CASES by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernard, Michelle) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernard, Michelle) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bernard, Michelle) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2022-00318180 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10254311) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7, #2 Proof of Service)(Bernard, Michelle) Duplicate Payment was made for the filing fee; refunded receipt ACAEDC-10254320 Modified on 6/3/2022 (Woodson, A). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Shellfish, Co., Incs is a litigant

Latest cases where THE HARTFORD STEAM BOILER INSPECTION AND INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Rene Bernard