This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2021 at 08:23:56 (UTC).

California Department of Toxic Substances Control et al v. Pacific Gas & Electric Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 California Department of Toxic Substances Control filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Pacific Gas Electric Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-07450

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

California Department of Toxic Substances Control

Toxic Substances Control Account

Defendants

Pacific Gas & Electric Company

Union Oil Company of California

Swepi LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Somerset Miles Perry

Attorney at California Office of the Attorney General

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor, P.O. Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Department of Toxic Substances Control, Toxic Substances Control Account.. (Perry, Somerset) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Department of Toxic Substances Control, Toxic Substances Control Account.. (Perry, Somerset) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Department of Toxic Substances Control, Toxic Substances Control Account.. (Perry, Somerset) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Department of Toxic Substances Control, Toxic Substances Control Account.. (Perry, Somerset) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2021 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/8/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Recovery of Response Costs and Declaratory Relief (42 U.S.C. 9601 et seq.) against Pacific Gas & Electric Company, Swepi LP, Union Oil Company of California, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-16425691). Filed by California Department of Toxic Substances Control, Toxic Substances Control Account. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Somerset) (Filed on 9/24/2021) Modified on 9/24/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWEPI LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Oil Company of California is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TOXIC SUBSTANCES CONTROL is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant