This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:33:31 (UTC).

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC v. MORRILL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 CALIBER HOME LOANS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MORRILL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and LANCE E. WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

LANCE E. WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIBER HOME LOANS INC

Defendant

BELINDA MORRILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A. DOONAN

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION to Extend Time 90 Days to Complete Service by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC Responses due by 7/15/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE TO #6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2019. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of CALIBER HOME LOANS INC (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with Certificate of Service by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BELINDA MORRILL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit H - Military Search

1 #7

Exhibit G - Notice of Mortgagor's Right to Cure

1 #6

Exhibit F - Quitclaim Assignment 1/24/19

1 #5

Exhbit E - Quitclaim Assignment 11/9/18

1 #4

Exhibit D - Assignment of Mortgage to Caliber Home Loans Inc

1 #3

Exhibit C - Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B - Note

1 #1

Exhibit A - Property Description

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BELINDA MORRILL, filed by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 6/20/2019) Fee due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment of Mortgage to Caliber Home Loans Inc, #5 Exhbit E - Quitclaim Assignment 11/9/18, #6 Exhibit F - Quitclaim Assignment 1/24/19, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Mortgagor's Right to Cure, #8 Exhibit H - Military Search)(slg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • Reset Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion to Extend Time : (Service of Process Deadline 9/20/2019) (jwr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER terminating #6 Order to Show Cause By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Service. Time to complete service is extended to September 20, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Extend Time 90 Days to Complete Service by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC Responses due by 7/15/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE TO #6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2019. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of CALIBER HOME LOANS INC (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with Certificate of Service by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1994129.), filed by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC.(LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from CALIBER HOME LOANS INC by 3/29/2019. (slg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to BELINDA MORRILL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BELINDA MORRILL, filed by CALIBER HOME LOANS INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 6/20/2019) Fee due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment of Mortgage to Caliber Home Loans Inc, #5 Exhbit E - Quitclaim Assignment 11/9/18, #6 Exhibit F - Quitclaim Assignment 1/24/19, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Mortgagor's Right to Cure, #8 Exhibit H - Military Search)(slg) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less