This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:06:47 (UTC).

Calhoun v. United States of America (INMATE 3)

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Calhoun filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America INMATE 3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Willie James Calhoun

Union Springs, AL 36089-5107

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew W. Shepherd

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

Po Box 197

Montgomery, AL 36101

John Thomas Harmon

Po Box 186

Pine Apple, AL 36768

Brett J. Talley

Attorney at U S Atty's Office

131 Clayton St

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

4 #6

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) ORDER: DIRECTING the Clerk to serve a copy of the 2255 motion upon the U.S Attorney for the Middle District of Alabama; The U.S. Attorney is ORDERED to file a response to the 2255 motion on or before 2/7/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/8/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #2

Criminal Docket Sheet (2:07-cr-103)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Willie James Calhoun. (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit, #2 Criminal Docket Sheet, #3 Criminal Judgment)(amf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #2 Criminal Docket Sheet, #3 Criminal Judgment) (amf, ). Modified on 1/8/2020 to attach the docket sheet & judgment which were inadvertently omitted (amf, ). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #1

Financial Affidavit

4 #1

Exhibit A

4 #4

Exhibit D

4 #5

Exhibit E

#4

(#4) RESPONSE TO ORDER re #2 Order filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Talley, Brett) Modified on 2/10/2020 to clarify the docket text to reflect this entry as a "response to order" & not a "reply brief" (amf, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #6 Certificate of Service) (amf, ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

4 #3

Exhibit C

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Talley on behalf of United States of America (Talley, Brett) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #3

Criminal Judgment (2:07-cr-103)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Calhoun why his #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) should not be denied as it was not filed within the applicable one-year limitation period and for the other reasons argued by the Government; Show Cause Response due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/11/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Calhoun why his #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) should not be denied as it was not filed within the applicable one-year limitation period and for the other reasons argued by the Government; Show Cause Response due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/11/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE TO ORDER re #2 Order filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Talley, Brett) Modified on 2/10/2020 to clarify the docket text to reflect this entry as a "response to order" & not a "reply brief" (amf, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #6 Certificate of Service) (amf, ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Talley on behalf of United States of America (Talley, Brett) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: DIRECTING the Clerk to serve a copy of the 2255 motion upon the U.S Attorney for the Middle District of Alabama; The U.S. Attorney is ORDERED to file a response to the 2255 motion on or before 2/7/2020, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/8/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Willie James Calhoun. (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit, #2 Criminal Docket Sheet, #3 Criminal Judgment)(amf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #2 Criminal Docket Sheet, #3 Criminal Judgment) (amf, ). Modified on 1/8/2020 to attach the docket sheet & judgment which were inadvertently omitted (amf, ). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.