This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2019 at 07:48:03 (UTC).

Calhoun v. Johnson Controls, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Calhoun filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Johnson Controls, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William C Lee and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00213

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Lee

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy A. Calhoun

Defendants

Johnson Controls, Inc.

John Doe

Cintas Corporate Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth J Sinak

Attorney at Boughter Law Office

127 W Berry St Suite 1001

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Robert J Boughter

Attorney at Boughter Law Office

127 W Berry St Suite 1001

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Sheri Bradtke McNeil

Attorney at Kopka Pinkus Dolin PC - CP/IN

9801 Connecticut Dr

Crown Point, IN 46307

Bailey J Samuel PHV

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP - KC/MO

2555 Grand Blvd

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Calvert S Miller

Attorney at Carson LLP - FW/IN

301 W Jefferson Blvd Ste 200

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Kimberly M Martin

Attorney at Carson LLP - FW/IN

301 W Jefferson Blvd Ste 200

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Rebecca Kleber

Attorney at Carson LLP - FW/IN

301 W Jefferson Blvd Ste 200

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#20

(#20) SUPPLEMENT to #19 Appendix, #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement, #18 Memorandum in Support Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.'s Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Samuel PHV, Bailey) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#19

(#19) APPENDIX to #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement, #18 Memorandum in Support Proposed Order by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Samuel PHV, Bailey) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM in Support of #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Samuel PHV, Bailey) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#17

(#17) MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Samuel PHV, Bailey) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER: Johnson Controls is AFFORDED to and including June 19, 2019, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement in an effort to establish diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/12/19. (ksp) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulation) by Defendants Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., John Doe. (Miller, Calvert) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bailey Jenae Samuel PHV for Johnson Controls, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 05/31/2019. (ace) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#11

(#14) ORDER granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bailey Jenae Samuel PHV for Johnson Controls, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 05/31/2019. (ace) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Calvert S Miller on behalf of Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. (Miller, Calvert) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Johnson Controls, Inc.. Amendment to #2 Notice of Appearance . (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#2

(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Johnson Controls, Inc.. Amendment to #2 Notice of Appearance . (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C-Email dated 5-14-19

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B-State Court File

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint and Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3894212.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1904-ct-000222, filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-State Court File, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Email dated 5-14-19, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • (#22) TELEPHONIC HEARING (scheduled as a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference) held on 6/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Kenneth Sinak. Dft appeared by attys Bailey Samuel and Sheri Bradtke McNeil. Atty Sinak anticipates filing a motion to file an Amended Complaint naming Aramark as an additional dft. Attys Samuel and Bradtke McNeil have no objection to the filing of an Amended Complaint. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 2:30 pm. Court to initiate call. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • (#21) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: On the Court's own motion, the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 10:30 am is CONVERTED to a telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Court will initiate call. Counsel only required to attend. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SUPPLEMENT to #19 Appendix, #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement, #18 Memorandum in Support Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.'s Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Samuel PHV, Bailey) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) APPENDIX to #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement, #18 Memorandum in Support Proposed Order by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Samuel PHV, Bailey) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM in Support of #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Samuel PHV, Bailey) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for More Definite Statement Defendant Johnson Controls Inc.'s Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Samuel PHV, Bailey) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. and John Doe ONLY re #15 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Pla's claims against Dft Johnson Controls Inc are not being dismissed. (lns) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: Johnson Controls is AFFORDED to and including June 19, 2019, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement in an effort to establish diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/12/19. (ksp) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulation) by Defendants Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., John Doe. (Miller, Calvert) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bailey Jenae Samuel PHV for Johnson Controls, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 05/31/2019. (ace) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Johnson Controls, Inc. ; answer due by June 19, 2019. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Cintas Corporate Services, Inc..(Miller, Calvert) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly M Martin on behalf of Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. (Martin, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Kleber on behalf of Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. (Kleber, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Calvert S Miller on behalf of Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. (Miller, Calvert) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Johnson Controls, Inc.. Amendment to #2 Notice of Appearance . (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE (kjp) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheri Bradtke McNeil on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3894212.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1904-ct-000222, filed by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-State Court File, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Email dated 5-14-19, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cintas Corporate Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNSON CONTROLS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheri Bradtke McNeil

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Calvert S Miller