This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2020 at 07:06:05 (UTC).

Calhoun v. Bridgeport Financial, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Calhoun filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Bridgeport Financial, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00329

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Calhoun

Defendant

Bridgeport Financial, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael S. Agruss

Attorney at Agruss Law Firm, LLC

4809 N Ravenwood Avenue, Suite 419

Chicago, IL 60640

Defendant Attorney

Lawrence Keith Iglesias

Attorney at Ellis Law Group, LLP

1425 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Affidavit

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER VACATING ALL PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES AND REQUESTING JOINT STATUS REPORT OR DISMISSAL ON OR BEFORE MAY 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/9/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Robin Calhoun of Settlement (Agruss, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Certificate of Interested Entities by Bridgeport Financial, Inc. (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/25/2020) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Bridgeport Financial, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byBridgeport Financial, Inc.. (Iglesias, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/25/2020) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) #10 ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/24/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #9 Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default filed by Bridgeport Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iglesias, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/21/2020) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BRIDGEPORT FINANCIAL, INC. (Related documents(s) #8 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Entry of Default against Bridgeport Financial, Inc. filed by Robin Calhoun. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Agruss, Michael) (Filed on 2/12/2020) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin Calhoun. Bridgeport Financial, Inc. served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Agruss, Michael) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Bridgeport Financial, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robin Calhoun.. (Agruss, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Agruss, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bridgeport Financial, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14073088.). Filed byRobin Calhoun. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Agruss, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGEPORT FINANCIAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S Agruss