This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 06:18:33 (UTC).

Cahoone v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Cahoone filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel D. Domenico and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01848

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelli Calhoone

Kelli Cahoone

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook Holdings

Facebook Operations

facebook payments

Facebook Technologies

Instagram, LLC

Siculus, Inc

Facebook Holdings, LLC

Facebook Operations, LLC

Facebook Payments, Inc.

Facebook Technologies, LLC

Siculus, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry I. Dunn

Attorney at Boesen Law LLC

4100 East Mississippi Avenue, Suite 1900

Denver, CO 80246

Clinton A. Richardson

Attorney at Beasley Allen Law Firm

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8572393)Attorney Barry I. Dunn added to party Kelli Calhoone(pty:pla), filed by Kelli Calhoone.(Dunn, Barry) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Clinton A. Richardson on behalf of Kelli CalhooneAttorney Clinton A. Richardson added to party Kelli Calhoone(pty:pla) (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (norlin, ) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Meta Platforms, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, & Siculus, Inc. re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kelli Cahoone. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Meta Platforms, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, & Siculus, Inc. re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kelli Cahoone. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Barry I. Dunn on behalf of Kelli CahooneAttorney Barry I. Dunn added to party Kelli Cahoone(pty:pla) (Dunn, Barry) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#13

(#13) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, ) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelli Cahoone. All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kelli Cahoone. All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, ) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Barry I. Dunn on behalf of Kelli CahooneAttorney Barry I. Dunn added to party Kelli Cahoone(pty:pla) (Dunn, Barry) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Meta Platforms, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, & Siculus, Inc. re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kelli Cahoone. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Administrative Notice : The #9 Summonses submitted are incomplete and will not be issued - all defendants must be listed in the caption - et al can not be used. Please complete the forms for issuance using the Summons Request event. (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Meta Platforms, Inc., Facebook Holdings, LLC, Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Facebook Technologies, LLC, Instagram, LLC, & Siculus, Inc. re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kelli Cahoone. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Docket(#8) ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Barry Dunn attempted to enter an appearance in this case by using his CM/ECF login and password to file Doc. No. 1, without affixing his "s/" signature to that document in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5(a), which incorporates 4.3 of Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). Counsel's purported appearance cannot be recognized. Counsel must file a proper Notice of Entry of Appearance to be recognized as attorney of record for plaintiff in this case.(Text Only Entry)(mfred) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/27/2022. Text Only Entry (dddlc4) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (norlin, ) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Clinton A. Richardson on behalf of Kelli CalhooneAttorney Clinton A. Richardson added to party Kelli Calhoone(pty:pla) (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Docket(#3) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Joseph G. VanZandt.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - An attorney who is a member of our bar in good standing MUST file a Notice of Entry of Appearance. No further action will be taken on case by our court and This case will be terminated in three hours if action is not taken (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Joseph G. VanZandt attempted to enter an appearance in this case by affixing his "s/" signature to the complaint. The court's Attorney Roll does not reflect that counsel is a member of the bar. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), counsel's purported appearance cannot be recognized. Counsel will need to file a Notice of Entry of Appearance upon admission to the bar of the court. The court does not permit admissions pro hac vice. (Text Only Entry)(mfred) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8572393)Attorney Barry I. Dunn added to party Kelli Calhoone(pty:pla), filed by Kelli Calhoone.(Dunn, Barry) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant