This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:24:04 (UTC).

Calero v. CoreCivic of Tennessee, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Calero filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CoreCivic of Tennessee, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are James O. Browning and Steven C. Yarbrough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00637

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James O. Browning

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Calero

Defendants

CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC

CoreCivic of Tennessee, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jared Robert Vander Dussen

Attorney at Western Agriculture, Resource and Business Advocates, LLP

400 Gold Ave Swste 1000

Albuquerque, NM 87102

A. Blair Dunn

Attorney at Western Agriculture, Resource and Business Advocates, LLP

400 Gold Sw Avesuite 1000

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorney

Robert Shawn Oller

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2425 East Camelback Roadsuite 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by Mark Calero. (Dunn, A.) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by CoreCivic of Tennessee, Inc.. (Oller, Robert) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mark Calero. (Dunn, A.) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CoreCivic of Tennessee, Inc.. (Oller, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Mark Calero. (Dunn, A.) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough VACATING the Scheduling Conference set for 09/16/2021 and all associated deadlines in #5 Initial Scheduling Order. The Court will reset the Scheduling Conference at a later time. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#7) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 09/16/2021 at 09:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by 09/07/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 08/10/2021. (cm) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CoreCivic of Tennessee, Inc.. (Oller, Robert) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CoreCivic of Tennessee, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CoreCivic, Inc. for CoreCivic of Tennessee, Inc.. (Oller, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7783013 re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Oller, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC from Seventh Judicial Distrcit, case number D-722-CV-2021-00072. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Memorandum, #4 Exhibit 4 - Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court Pleadings, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Removal to State Court, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Removal to Adverse Party, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oller, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Corecivic of Tennessee LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Shawn Oller