This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2021 at 11:06:10 (UTC).

Caldwell v. Allied Universal Security Services LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Caldwell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Allied Universal Security Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01461

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emmett Caldwell

San Juan, PR 00908

Defendants

AIG American International Group

Allied Universal Security Services LLC

Ramon Adjuster

Retailer Value Inc.

M. Montanez

Home Depot P.R. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Valerie M. Blay-Soler

250 Ponce De Leon Ave, Suite 900

San Juan, PR 00918

Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago

P.O. Box 194108

San Juan, PR 00919

Defendant Attorneys

Jeannette M. Lopez

Attorney at Oliveras & Ortiz, PSC

171 Chardon Ave, Suite 406

San Juan, PR 00918

Jose H. Vivas

Attorney at Vivas & Vivas

P.O. Box 330951

Ponce, PR 00733-0951

Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera

Attorney at Estrella, LLC

Po Box 9023596

San Juan, PR 00902-3596

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) MOTION to Withdraw & Appear Attorney filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Home Depot P.R. Inc. Responses due by 10/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette) Modified on 10/13/2021 to edit text (gav). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#54

(#54) MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 10/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette) Modified on 9/28/2021 to remove italics (gav). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#53

(#53) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC Re: #46 MOTION for Default Entry as to AIG American International Group filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC. (Lopez, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

50 #1

Envelope

#50

(#50) MOTION for extension of time to Service of Process filed by Emmett Caldwell, pro se. Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(idg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#48

(#48) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2021 to File Answer re: #25 Amended Complaint filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Lopez, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#47

(#47) MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

#46

(#46) MOTION for Default Entry as to AIG American International Group filed by Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Lago, Roque) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#25

(#48) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2021 to File Answer re: #25 Amended Complaint filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Lopez, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Category Sheet

1 #2

ExhibiB A

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AIG American International Group, filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Service due by 12/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 ExhibiB A, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet).(mg) Modified on 9/8/2020 to add text as to pro se. (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #5 Summons) (mg). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION to Withdraw & Appear Attorney filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Home Depot P.R. Inc. Responses due by 10/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette) Modified on 10/13/2021 to edit text (gav). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 10/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette) Modified on 9/28/2021 to remove italics (gav). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC Re: #46 MOTION for Default Entry as to AIG American International Group filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Allied Universal Security Services LLC. (Lopez, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER noted and denied without prejudice #50 Motion for extension of time. As Plaintiff is represented by counsel, he should file any requests through counsel. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/14/2021. (ERC) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER granting #47 MOTION for Leave to Appear; granting #48 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2021 to File Answer re: #25 Amended Complaint; and granting #49 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #46 MOTION for Default Entry. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/14/2021. (ERC) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION for extension of time to Service of Process filed by Emmett Caldwell, pro se. Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(idg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION for Extension of Time until September 27, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #46 MOTION for Default Entry as to AIG American International Group filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Lopez, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2021 to File Answer re: #25 Amended Complaint filed by Emmett Caldwell filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Lopez, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Allied Universal Security Services LLC Responses due by 9/27/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION for Default Entry as to AIG American International Group filed by Roque Uriel Rivera-Lago on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Lago, Roque) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** NOTICE of filing Letter by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). (mg) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 10/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit). (mg) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Emmett Caldwell Pro Se, re: l Legal Description, Sales Receipt and Transfer of Ownership. (mg) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Expedite Trial filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION requesting Restraining Order/s filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(mg) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION requesting Subpoena to Produce Surveillance videos filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/30/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (mg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Affidavit by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope). (mg) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to AIG American International Group filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit).(mg) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AIG American International Group, filed by Emmett Caldwell, Pro Se. Service due by 12/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 ExhibiB A, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet).(mg) Modified on 9/8/2020 to add text as to pro se. (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2020: #5 Summons) (mg). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied Universal Security Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeannette M. Lopez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jose H. Vivas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera